Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2952041


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2020 [2020/12]
07.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
24.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2020 [2020/09]
05.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.01.2020  [2020/01]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
04.10.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
17.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
02.11.2018 Change - applicant published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
26.10.2018 (Expected) grant published on  28.11.2018  [2018/48]
23.10.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.10.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.10.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.02.2018 First examination report
29.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2017 Amendment by applicant
10.09.2016 Supplementary search report published on  12.10.2016  [2016/41]
09.09.2016 Change - classification published on  12.10.2016  [2016/41]
09.09.2016 Change - classification published on  12.10.2016  [2016/41]
20.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
01.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2015 Change - representative
06.11.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
06.11.2015 Request for examination filed published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
02.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
07.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
04.09.2015 Change - representative
04.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication