Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2952041
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018317054Global Dossier 01.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201816030128 09.07.2018
US201414206887 12.03.2014
US201361782421 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014279538Global Dossier 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414206887 12.03.2014
US201361782421 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2016518735Global Dossier 23.06.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US24133 12.03.2014
US201361782421 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2952041Global Dossier 28.11.2018B1
EP2952041 12.10.2016A4
EP2952041 09.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US24133 12.03.2014
US201361782421 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014159548Global Dossier 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361782421 14.03.2013