Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2971040

EP2971040 - METHODS OF CELL CULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
301 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2018/18]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
675 West Kendall Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PRENTICE, Holly
35 Nathan Lane
Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/38]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2016/03]Simpson, Tobias Rutger , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Application number, filing date14775649.812.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US23924
Priority number, dateUS20131382933314.03.2013         Original published format: US201313829333
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014159499
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2971040
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2971040
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/02, C07K16/00, C12N15/63, G01N33/68
[2018/13]
Former International [2016/03]C12P21/04, C12N5/00, C12N5/07
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBA30.07.2015
ME30.07.2015
TitleGerman:ZELLKULTURVERFAHREN[2016/03]
English:METHODS OF CELL CULTURE[2016/03]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2015National basic fee paid 
30.07.2015Search fee paid 
30.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
15.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2018Fee for grant paid
09.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2019   
REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  17.06.2019   
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  18.06.2019   
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Hemsath, Lars, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  18.06.2019   
KELTIE LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Moore, Michael Richard
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
 05  19.06.2019   
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts - und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 06  19.06.2019   
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 07  19.06.2019   
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  19.06.2019   
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 09  19.06.2019   
Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp
Fünf Höfe
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 10  19.06.2019   
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [2019/30]
Former [2019/29]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2019   
REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2008154014  (AMGEN INC [US]; MCCOY REBECCA E [US]; MORRIS ARVIA E [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * example 2; claim 16 * [I] 4,11;
 [A]US6673575  (FRANZE REINHARD [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 58 *;
 [A]  - IGARASHI K ET AL, "Modulation of cellular function by polyamines", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 42, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BIOCEL.2009.07.009, ISSN 1357-2725, (20100101), pages 39 - 51, (20090728), XP026909603 [A] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biocel.2009.07.009
 [A]  - JEFFERIS ROY, "Glycosylation as a strategy to improve antibody-based therapeutics", NATURE REVIEWS. DRUG DISCOVERY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20090301), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1038/NRD2804, ISSN 1474-1784, pages 226 - 234, XP002600969 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRD2804
International search[Y]US2010113294  (VENKATARAMAN ET AL.);
 [A]US2010221823  (MCCOY ET AL.);
 [Y]  - BIOL-N'GARAGBA ET AL., "Polyamine participation in the maturation of glycoprotein fucosylation, but not siatylation, in rat small intestine.", PEDIATR RES., (20020101), vol. 51, no. 5, doi:10.1203/00006450-200205000-00014, pages 625 - 634, XP055286193

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1203/00006450-200205000-00014
 [A]  - GREC O ET AL., "Influence of spermine on intestinal maturation of the glycoprotein glycosylation process in neonatal rats", BIOCHEM. J., (20000101), vol. 345, no. 1, doi:10.1042/BJ3450069, pages 69 - 75, XP055286196

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj3450069
 [A]  - HOSSLER ET AL., "Optimal and consistent protein glycosylation in mammalian cell culture.", GLYCOBIOLOGY., (20090901), vol. 19, no. 9, doi:10.1093/GLYCOB/CWP079, pages 936 - 949, XP055112498

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cwp079
by applicantWO2008154014
 US6673575
 US5807715
 US5721121
 WO0230954
 US7541164
 US7332303
 WO9222324
 WO9846645
 US6180370
 WO2008128216
 WO2008128220
 WO2008128218
 WO2008130926
 WO2008128225
 WO2008130924
 WO2008128221
 WO2008128228
 WO2008128227
 WO2008128230
 WO2008128219
 WO2008128222
 WO2010071817
 WO2010071824
 WO2010085251
 WO2011069056
 WO2011127322
    - LOGAN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 8, pages 355 - 359
    - BITTNER et al., Methods in Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 153, pages 516 - 544
    - CHASIN et al., Som. Cell Molec. Genet., (19860000), vol. 12, pages 555 - 556
    - KOLKEKAR et al., Biochem., (19970000), vol. 36, pages 10901 - 10909
    - G. URLAUB; L.A. CHASIN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19800000), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220
    - L.H. GRAF; L.A. CHASIN, Molec. Cell. Biol., (19820000), vol. 2, pages 93 - 96
    - EDMONDS et al., Mol. Biotech., (20060000), vol. 34, pages 179 - 190
    - PICHLER et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20110000), vol. 108, pages 386 - 94
    - URLAUB; CHASIN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4216
    - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen. Virol., (19770000), vol. 36, page 59
    - MATHER, Biol. Reprod., (19800000), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251
    - MATHER, Ann. NY Acad. Sci., (19820000), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68
    - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, (19850000), vol. I and II
    - KUSANO et al., Planta, (20080000), vol. 228, pages 367 - 381
    - JEFFERIS, Nature Reviews, (20090000), vol. 8, pages 226 - 234
    - ARNOLD et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 29080 - 29087
    - MATTU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, pages 2260 - 2272
    - NETTLETON et al., Int. Arch. Allergy Immunol., (19950000), vol. 107, pages 328 - 329
    - JEFFERIS et al., Immunol. Rev., (19980000), vol. 163, pages 59 - 76
    - WRIGHT et al., Trends Biotech, (19970000), vol. 15, pages 26 - 32
    - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - BRINKMAN et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19950000), vol. 182, pages 41 - 50
    - MORRISON, Science, (19850000), vol. 229, page 1202
    - SEGAL et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (20010000), vol. 248, pages 1 - 6
    - TUTT et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, page 60
    - HALLEWELL et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, pages 5260 - 5268
    - ALFTHAN et al., Protein Eng., (19950000), vol. 8, pages 725 - 731
    - WILSON et al., Cell, (19840000), vol. 37, page 767
    - "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", ARNON et al., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, Alan R. Liss, Inc., (19850000), pages 243 - 56
    - "Antibodies For Drug Delivery", HELLSTROM et al., Controlled Drug Delivery, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19870000), pages 623 - 53
    - ANUMULA, Anal. Biochem., (20060000), vol. 350, no. 1, page 1
    - KLEIN et al., Anal. Biochem., (19890000), vol. 179, page 162
    - "Carbohydrate Analysis", TOWNSEND, R.R., High Performance Liquid Chromatography and Capillary Electrophoresis, (19950000), pages 181 - 209
    - WEINER et al., J. Pharm. Biomed. Anal., (19970000), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 571 - 9
    - SRINIVAS et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19960000), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 1 - 4
    - SRINIVAS et al., Pharm. Res., (19970000), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 911 - 6