Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2968867

EP2968867 - A CATHETER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.12.2015
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laborie
6415 Northwest Drive
Unit 11
Mississauga, Ontario L4V IX1 / CA
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / STIMPSON, Philip, G.
1501 Northpoint Parkway
Suite 103
West Palm Beach, FL 33407 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Clarke, Geoffrey Howard
Lane IP Limited The Forum St Paul's
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Clarke, Geoffrey Howard
Lane IP Limited
2 Throgmorton Avenue
London EC2N 2DG / GB
Application number, filing date14775663.913.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US26271
Priority number, dateUS201361779996P13.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361779996 P
US201361867395P19.08.2013         Original published format: US 201361867395 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014160300
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2968867
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR02.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/16, A61B5/00, A61B5/03, A61B5/20, A61M25/00
[2017/11]
Former International [2016/03]A61M25/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:KATHETERANORDNUNG[2016/03]
English:A CATHETER ASSEMBLY[2016/03]
French:ENSEMBLE CATHÉTER[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2015National basic fee paid 
08.10.2015Search fee paid 
08.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
05.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010048638  (INNERSPACE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [XY]US2010114063  (RECINELLA DANIEL K [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 19] , [0 23] - [0027] - [0 34] * [Y] 9;
 [X]EP2494932  (EKOS CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 19] , [0 83] , [ 120] , [ 134] , [ 144] *;
 [Y]US6210375  (MOULTON WILLIAM G [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 7, lines 28-31 *;
 [A]KR20120086901  (MEDIFIRST CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2010114063  (RECINELLA DANIEL K [US], et al);
 [Y]US5314443  (RUDNICK JAMES J [US]);
 [A]US2010094113  (ROBINSON MARK RIES [US], et al);
 [A]US2011295301  (HOEM JON H [CH], et al);
 [A]WO2010033468  (MOBITECH REGENERATIVE MEDICINE [US], et al);
 [A]US5573007  (BOBO SR DONALD E [US])