Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2967766

EP2967766 - HEALING ABUTMENT KIT WITH COMBINATION OF SCANNING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/03]HEALING ABUTMENT ASSEMBLY WITH COMBINATION OF SCANNING FEATURES
[2019/13]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet 3i, LLC
4555 Riverside Drive
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
[2019/38]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Biomet 3i, LLC
4555 Riverside Drive
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HERRINGTON, Stephen, M.
5935 Barclay Lane
Naples, Florida 34110 / US
02 / GOODMAN, Ralph, E.
4966 Summit Boulevard
West Palm Beach, Florida 33415 / US
03 / SUTTIN, Zachary, B.
2664 Greenway Drive
Jupiter, Florida 33458 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/38]
Former [2016/03]Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
Application number, filing date14776455.924.02.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US17929
Priority number, dateUS20131379889413.03.2013         Original published format: US201313798894
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014158534
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2967766
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2967766
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEILUNGSPFEILER-KIT MIT KOMBINATION VON SCAN-FUNKTIONEN[2019/13]
English:HEALING ABUTMENT KIT WITH COMBINATION OF SCANNING FEATURES[2019/13]
French:KIT DE PILIER DE CICATRISATION AVEC COMBINAISON DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE SCANNAGE[2019/13]
Former [2016/03]EINHEILABUTMENT MIT KOMBINATION VON ABTASTUNGSMERKMALEN
Former [2016/03]HEALING ABUTMENT ASSEMBLY WITH COMBINATION OF SCANNING FEATURES
Former [2016/03]ENSEMBLE PILIER DE CICATRISATION À COMBINAISON D'ÉLÉMENTS DE BALAYAGE
Entry into regional phase04.09.2015National basic fee paid 
04.09.2015Search fee paid 
04.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
30.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
11.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
08.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2019Fee for grant paid
05.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
11.09.2017Request for further processing filed
11.09.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.09.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2012295226  (ROBB T TAIT [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0142] * * figures 1-17 * [Y] 11;
 [YA]US2008233537  (AMBER JOHN T [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0041] - [0078] * * figures 1-10 * [A] 1-10,12-15;
 [A]US2008261176  (HURSON STEVE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0121] * * figures 1-17 *;
 [A]WO2012126475  (ELOS MEDTECH PINOL AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 8-13 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]KR101108280B  (KIM YONG SANG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0040] * * figures 1-4 *
International search[X]US2012295226  (ROBB T TAIT [US], et al);
 [A]US6129548  (LAZZARA RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [A]US2008261176  (HURSON STEVE [US]);
 [AP]US2013196290  (HERRINGTON STEPHEN M [US], et al)