Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2972165

EP2972165 - TEMPERATURE SENSING GREASE FITTING WITH ALARM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REGAL BELOIT AMERICA, INC.
200 State Street
Beloit, WI 53511 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LEWIS, Matthew I.
403 N. Napoleon Street
Valparaiso, Indiana 46383 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)St Clair Jones, Gregory Arthur Langley , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Thorniley, Peter
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14778951.511.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US22942
Priority number, dateUS201361777450P12.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361777450 P
US20141420197210.03.2014         Original published format: US201414201972
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014164590
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2972165
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16C17/24, F16C19/52, G01K1/14, F16C33/10, F16C33/66, G01K5/70, // G08B21/18, G01K13/02, F16C35/00
[2016/52]
Former International [2016/03]G01K13/00, G01K7/00, G01K1/02, F16C41/00, F16C37/00, G08B21/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURMESSENDER SCHMIERNIPPEL MIT ALARM[2016/03]
English:TEMPERATURE SENSING GREASE FITTING WITH ALARM[2016/03]
French:RACCORD GRAISSEUR À DÉTECTION DE TEMPÉRATURE AVEC ALARME[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2015National basic fee paid 
09.10.2015Search fee paid 
09.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
23.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5439296  (EL-IBIARY YEHIA [US]) [X] 1,6,7,9,10 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US1919693  (FAUS HERBERT W) [X] 1,5-7,9,13 * page 2, line 82 - page 3, line 5; figures 5-7 *;
 [X]EP1256792  (MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYS LTD [US]) [X] 1,5,9,10,13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2010224015  (PAXTON KRIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,12,15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]WO2004042340  (FAG KUGELFISCHER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6236328  (SMITH CHARLES C [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9,12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5691707  (SMITH CHARLES C [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3487467  (GRUBER THOMAS J) [Y] 1-7,9,15 * column 4, line 19 - column 8, line 29; figures 5-12 *
International search[Y]JP2005344863  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [Y]JPH08268279  (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST, et al);
 [Y]JP2009210022  (JTEKT CORP);
 [A]US5315954  (RICHMOND ALLAN [GB]);
 [A]US4268812  (SATTERLEE JESSE D)
by applicantUS5439296
 US2010224015