Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2973574 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2973574



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 307
07.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.02.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.02.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.02.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
07.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.02.2020 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
27.09.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.09.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.09.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.09.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
27.09.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
29.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
29.07.2019 Description Search / examination 1
29.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.07.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
18.03.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.03.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.03.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
18.03.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
31.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.10.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.05.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
22.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
22.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
25.10.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
13.10.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.05.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
17.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
03.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.10.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
14.08.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
09.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32