Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2973574


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.02.2020 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.09.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.07.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.03.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.03.2019 Change - inventor
01.02.2019 Change - classification published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
01.02.2019 Change - classification published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
16.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.05.2017 Amendment by applicant
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2016 Supplementary search report published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
21.10.2016 Change - classification published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
21.10.2016 Change - classification published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
25.05.2016 Amendment by applicant
13.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.02.2016 Change - inventor published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
18.12.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.12.2015 Request for examination filed published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2015 Change - representative
07.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
24.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication