Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2973574 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480013988 CN201810152006 EP14779178



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019097125Global Dossier 28.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201615194875 28.06.2016
US201816202536 28.11.2018
US201815952507 13.04.2018
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10276781Global Dossier 30.04.2019B2
US2018233657 16.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201615194875 28.06.2016
US201815952507 13.04.2018
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9972770Global Dossier 15.05.2018B2
US2016308118 20.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201615194875 28.06.2016
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102039280BGlobal Dossier 31.10.2019B1
KR20180018858 21.02.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2014US22555 10.03.2014
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101831504BGlobal Dossier 26.02.2018B1
KR20150123893 04.11.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014US22555 10.03.2014
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6159009BGlobal Dossier 05.07.2017B2
JP2016515304 26.05.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US22555 10.03.2014
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108198584Global Dossier 22.06.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201480013988 10.03.2014
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105074829BGlobal Dossier 27.03.2018B
CN105074829 18.11.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014US22555 10.03.2014
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2973574Global Dossier 23.11.2016A4
EP2973574 20.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US22555 10.03.2014
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014164482Global Dossier 09.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9379315Global Dossier 28.06.2016B2
US2014264663 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313797185 12.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI555173B 21.10.2016B
TW201448170 16.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313797185 12.03.2013