Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2973574

EP2973574 - MEMORY CELLS, METHODS OF FABRICATION, SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE STRUCTURES, AND MEMORY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.09.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 South Federal Way Mail Stop 525
Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Wei
25 Martine Avenue Apt. 1006
White Plains, New York 10606 / US
02 / MURTHY, Sunil
130 Tanjong Rhu Road
Apartment. 04-27 Lobby R
Singapore 436918 / SG
03 / KULA, Witold
9685 New Avenue
Gilroy, California 95020 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/12]01 / CHEN, Wei
25 Martine Avenue Apt. 1006
White Plains, New York 10606 / US
02 / MURTHY, Sunil
130 Tanjong Rhu Road
Apartment. 04-27 Lobby R
Singapore 436915 / SG
03 / KULA, Witold
9685 New Avenue
Gilroy, California 95020 / US
Former [2016/03]01 / CHEN, Wei
25 Martine Avenue Apt. 1006
White Plains, New York 10606 / US
02 / MURTHY, Sunil
25 Martine Avenue Apt. 906
White Plains, New York 10606 / US
03 / KULA, Witold
9685 New Avenue
Gilroy, California 95020 / US
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14779178.410.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US22555
Priority number, dateUS20131379718512.03.2013         Original published format: US201313797185
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014164482
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2973574
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L43/08, H01L43/10, H01L43/12
[2016/47]
Former International [2016/03]G11C11/15
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERZELLEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG, HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTSTRUKTUREN UND SPEICHERSYSTEME[2016/03]
English:MEMORY CELLS, METHODS OF FABRICATION, SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE STRUCTURES, AND MEMORY SYSTEMS[2016/03]
French:CELLULES DE MÉMOIRE, PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION, STRUCTURES DE DISPOSITIFS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET SYSTÈMES DE MÉMOIRE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2015National basic fee paid 
07.10.2015Search fee paid 
07.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
22.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2012148874  (OHMORI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0062] - [0090] , [0118] - [0120]; figures 1,2,16A,B * [Y] 3-7,9;
 [Y]US2012146167  (HUAI YIMING [US], et al) [Y] 3-7,9 * paragraphs [0019] - [0057]; figures 2-7 *;
 [A]US2010096716  (RANJAN RAJIV YADAV [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0080]; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2011064969  (CHEN EUGENE YOUJUN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0023] - [0069]; figures 1-4 *
International search[X]US2012146167  (HUAI YIMING [US], et al);
 [A]US2012012953  (LOTTIS DANIEL [US], et al);
 [A]US2008205130  (SUN JIJUN [US], et al);
 [A]US2011049658  (ZHENG YUANKAI [US], et al);
 [A]US2011309418  (NAKAYAMA MASAHIKO [JP], et al)
by applicantUS2012148874
 US2012146167