Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2982558

EP2982558 - HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.10.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUI, Hiroki
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / YAMANAKA, Fumihiro
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2016/06]
Application number, filing date14779917.513.03.2014
[2016/06]
WO2014JP56755
Priority number, dateJP2013007869604.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013078696
[2016/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014162839
Date:09.10.2014
Language:JA
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2982558
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60W10/06, B60K6/48, B60K6/547, B60L11/14, B60W20/00, F02D29/02
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDFAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/06]
English:HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE[2016/06]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE[2016/06]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2015Translation filed 
03.11.2015National basic fee paid 
03.11.2015Search fee paid 
03.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
03.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
16.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.04.2018
03.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.04.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination05.06.2018Appeal received No.  T2232/18
13.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
13.08.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2010201962  (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019]; figures 1,3,12 *;
 [Y]JP2013035336  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] , [0040] , [0067] , [0068] , [0070] - [0072]; figures 1,7,8 *;
 [A]EP2025904  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2,3,5,7 *
International search[Y]JP2010201962  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [Y]JP2010023660  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [Y]JP2013035336  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP);
 [A]JP2007261442  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [A]JP2012086652  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [A]JP2011084137  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP)
by applicantJP2008179242