Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2985479

EP2985479 - SYNTHETIC RESIN SLIDE BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oiles Corporation
2-70, Kounan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
For all designated states
Oiles Deutschland GmbH
Boschstrasse 3
61239 Ober-Moerlen / DE
[2017/47]
Former [2016/07]For all designated states
Oiles Corporation
2-70, Kounan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
For all designated states
Oiles Deutschland GmbH
Boschstrasse 3
61239 Ober-Moerlen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SAKAIRI, Yoshikazu
c/o OILES CORPORATION Fujisawa Plant 8
Kirihara-cho
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP
02 / SAITO, Katsunori
c/o OILES CORPORATION Fujisawa Plant 8
Kirihara-cho
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP
03 / HAMRODI, Robert
c/o OILES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Boschstrasse 3
Ober-Moerlen 61239 / DE
04 / METZLER, Kai
c/o OILES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Boschstrasse 3
Ober-Moerlen 61239 / DE
05 / IGARASHI, Yoshiteru
c/o OILES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Boschstrasse 3
Ober-Moerlen 61239 / DE
 [2016/07]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/47]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2016/07]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date14782108.605.03.2014
[2016/07]
WO2014JP01216
Priority number, dateJP2013008339911.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013083399
[2016/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014167771
Date:16.10.2014
Language:JA
[2014/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2985479
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2985479
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16C17/04, B60G15/06, F16C17/02, F16C17/26, F16C33/20, F16C33/74, F16C35/02, F16F9/32, F16F9/54, F16C17/10, F16C17/18
[2016/41]
Former International [2016/07]F16C17/04, B60G15/06, F16C17/02, F16C17/26, F16C33/20, F16C33/74, F16C35/02, F16F9/32, F16F9/54
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KUNSTHARZGLEITLAGER[2016/07]
English:SYNTHETIC RESIN SLIDE BEARING[2016/07]
French:PALIER À CONTACT LISSE EN RÉSINE SYNTHÉTIQUE[2016/07]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2015Translation filed 
11.09.2015National basic fee paid 
11.09.2015Search fee paid 
11.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/07]
24.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2017Fee for grant paid
10.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2017
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
IE05.03.2018
LU05.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
IE05.03.2018
LU05.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
LU05.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]CA2892429  (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 *
International search[A]JP2010053908  (OILES CORP.);
 [A]JP2012036983  (OILES CORP.);
 [A]JP2011169469  (OILES CORP.);
 [A]JPH08159160  (OILES CORP.)
by applicantJP2004293589
 JP2009250278