Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2983679

EP2983679 - ANTIMICROBIAL CATIONIC POLYCARBONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
For all designated states
Agency for Science, Technology and Research
1 Fusionopolis Way, No. 20-10 Connexis
Singapore 138632 / SG
[2016/07]
Inventor(s)01 / COADY, Daniel Joseph
650 Harry Road
Almaden Research Center
San Jose, California 95120-6099 / US
02 / DIPIETRO, Richard Anthony
650 Harry Road
Almaden Research Center
San Jose, California 95120-6099 / US
03 / ENGLER, Amanda Catherine
650 Harry Road
Almaden Research Center
San Jose, California 95120-6099 / US
04 / HEDRICK, James Lupton
650 Harry Road
Almaden Research Center
San Jose, California 95120-6099 / US
05 / CHIN, Willy
31 Biopolis Way
138669 Singapore / SG
06 / LEE, Ashlynn L. Z.
31 Biopolis Way
138669 Singapore / SG
07 / NG, Victor W. L.
31 Biopolis Way
138669 Singapore / SG
08 / ONG, Zhan-Yuin
31 Biopolis Way
138669 Singapore / SG
09 / YANG, Yi Yan
31 Biopolis Way
138669 Singapore / SG
 [2016/07]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2016/07]
Application number, filing date14782236.531.03.2014
[2016/07]
WO2014US32313
Priority number, dateUS20131385903709.04.2013         Original published format: US201313859037
[2016/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014168771
Date:16.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2983679
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014
[2016/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.11.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/785, A61K31/80, A01N33/12, C08G64/02
[2017/20]
Former International [2016/50]A61K31/785, A61K31/80, A01N33/12, A61K47/48, C08G64/02
Former International [2016/07]A61K31/785, A61K31/80
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
TitleGerman:ANTIMIKROBIELLE KATIONISCHE POLYCARBONATE[2016/07]
English:ANTIMICROBIAL CATIONIC POLYCARBONATES[2016/07]
French:POLYCARBONATES CATIONIQUES ANTIMICROBIENS[2016/07]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2015National basic fee paid 
15.10.2015Search fee paid 
15.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/07]
15.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2011150977  (HEDRICK JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0097] - [0101] * * pages 36-42; examples 13-19 * * page 52; example 27 * * page 54; example 28 * * page 54; table 13 * * claims 37-45 * [Y] 1-4,9-12;
 [Y]US2012251608  (COADY DANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0072] - [0073] * * page 7; compound - * * paragraphs [0134] - [0140] * * pages 45-49; examples 22-36 * * page 50; table 14 * * claim - *;
 [Y]WO2012075147  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * page 24, lines 12-35 * * claim - *;
 [Y]US2007122441  (MURATA HIRONOBU [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0025] * * claim - *;
 [Y]US2012232018  (HEDRICK JAMES LUPTON [US], et al) [Y] 5-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] - [0052] * * claim - *;
 [Y]  - FREDRIK NEDERBERG ET AL, "Biodegradable nanostructures with selective lysis of microbial membranes", NATURE CHEMISTRY, GB, (20110501), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nchem.1012, ISSN 1755-4330, pages 409 - 414, XP055305869 [Y] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * page 409, column r, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 410; figure 1 * * page 410, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 410, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 411, column l * * page 413, column l, paragraph last *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchem.1012
 [Y]  - MIZERSKA U ET AL, "Polysiloxane cationic biocides with imidazolium salt (ImS) groups, synthesis and antibacterial properties", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, vol. 45, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.EURPOLYMJ.2008.11.045, ISSN 0014-3057, (20090301), pages 779 - 787, (20090221), XP025960950 [Y] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * page 785; figure 1; table 2 * * page 786; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eurpolymj.2008.11.045
 [Y]  - AMANDA C ENGLER ET AL, "Emerging trends in macromolecular antimicrobials to fight multi-drug-resistant infections", NANO TODAY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.NANTOD.2012.04.003, ISSN 1748-0132, (20120421), pages 201 - 222, (20120430), XP028428835 [Y] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * page 206; table 1 * * page 208; table 3 * * page 209, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 211; table 4 * * page 217; figure 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nantod.2012.04.003
 [T]  - VICTOR WEE LIN NG ET AL, "Antimicrobial Polycarbonates: Investigating the Impact of Nitrogen-Containing Heterocycles as Quaternizing Agents", MACROMOLECULES, US, (20140225), vol. 47, no. 4, doi:10.1021/ma402641p, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 1285 - 1291, XP055306661 [T] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma402641p
 [T]  - WILLY CHIN ET AL, "Biodegradable Broad-Spectrum Antimicrobial Polycarbonates: Investigating the Role of Chemical Structure on Activity and Selectivity", MACROMOLECULES, (20131126), vol. 46, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ma4019685, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 8797 - 8807, XP055090853 [T] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma4019685
 [T]  - AMANDA C. ENGLER ET AL, "Antimicrobial Polycarbonates: Investigating the Impact of Balancing Charge and Hydrophobicity Using a Same-Centered Polymer Approach", BIOMACROMOLECULES, US, (20131209), vol. 14, no. 12, doi:10.1021/bm401248t, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 4331 - 4339, XP055305946 [T] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm401248t
 [T]  - JUNCHI CHENG ET AL, "Biodegradable Antimicrobial Polycarbonates with In Vivo Efficacy against Multidrug-Resistant MRSA Systemic Infection", ADVANCED HEALTHCARE MATERIALS, DE, (20151001), vol. 4, no. 14, doi:10.1002/adhm.201500471, ISSN 2192-2640, pages 2128 - 2136, XP055309165 [T] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adhm.201500471
 [Y]  - ASHLYNN L Z LEE ET AL, "The use of cholesterol-containing biodegradable block copolymers to exploit hydrophobic interactions for the delivery of anticancer drugs", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 33, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2011.11.032, ISSN 0142-9612, (20111114), pages 1921 - 1928, (20111117), XP028341229 [Y] 5-15 * abstract * * scheme 1; page 1923 * * page 1927, column l, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2011.11.032
 [Y]  - E. I. GEIHE ET AL, "Designed guanidinium-rich amphipathic oligocarbonate molecular transporters complex, deliver and release siRNA in cells", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20120814), vol. 109, no. 33, doi:10.1073/pnas.1211361109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13171 - 13176, XP055350121 [Y] 5-15 * abstract * * page 13172; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1211361109
 [T]  - ASHLYNN L. Z. LEE ET AL, "Injectable Hydrogels from Triblock Copolymers of Vitamin E-Functionalized Polycarbonate and Poly(ethylene glycol) for Subcutaneous Delivery of Antibodies for Cancer Therapy", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, DE, (20140301), vol. 24, no. 11, doi:10.1002/adfm.201301307, ISSN 1616-301X, pages 1538 - 1550, XP055234578 [T] 5-15 * the whole document * * page 1539, column l, paragraphs 2-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201301307
 [T]  - VICTOR WEE LIN NG ET AL, "Synergistic Co-Delivery of Membrane-Disrupting Polymers with Commercial Antibiotics against Highly Opportunistic Bacteria", ADVANCED MATERIALS, DE, (20130909), vol. 25, no. 46, doi:10.1002/adma.201302952, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 6730 - 6736, XP055305907 [T] 5-15 * the whole document * * page 630, column r, paragraph 2; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201302952
 [T]  - DANIEL J. COADY ET AL, "Enhancement of Cationic Antimicrobial Materials via Cholesterol Incorporation", ADVANCED HEALTHCARE MATERIALS, DE, (20140601), vol. 3, no. 6, doi:10.1002/adhm.201300554, ISSN 2192-2640, pages 882 - 889, XP055306665 [T] 5-15 * the whole document * * page 883, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adhm.201300554
International search[A]US2012251608  (COADY DANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012245218  (FUKUSHIMA KAZUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * entire document *;
 [AP]US2014072607  (HEDRICK JAMES L [US], et al) [A, P] 1-31 * entire document *;
 [A]  - QIAO et al., "Highly dynamic biodegradable micelles capable of lysing Gram-positive and Gram-negative bacterial membrane.", Biomaterials, (20120000), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 1146 - 1153, XP028115491 [A] 1-31 * . entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2011.10.020
 [AP]  - LEE et al., "Injectable Hydrogels from Triblock Copolymers of Vitamin E-Functionalized Polycarbonate and Poly(ethylene glycol) for Subcutaneous Delivery of Antibodies for Cancer Therapy.", Advanced Functional Materials, (20140000), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 1538 - 1550, XP055234578 [AP] 1-31 * . entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201301307