Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2985262

EP2985262 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING SILANE COMPOUND OR CHLOROSILANE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/07]METHOD FOR PURIFYING SILANE COMPOUND OR CHLOROSILANE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON, AND METHOD FOR REGENERATING WEAKLY BASIC ION-EXCHANGE RESIN
[2018/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[2016/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIDA, Masahiko
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd.
Specialty Chemicals Research Center
28-1
Nishifukushima, Kubiki-ku
Joetsu-shi Niigata 942-8601 / JP
02 / SAITO, Hiroshi
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd.
Specialty Chemicals Research Center
28-1
Nishifukushima, Kubiki-ku
Joetsu-shi Niigata 942-8601 / JP
03 / YOSHIDA, Atsushi
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd.
Specialty Chemicals Research Center
28-1
Nishifukushima, Kubiki-ku
Joetsu-shi Niigata 942-8601 / JP
 [2016/07]
Representative(s)Forrest, Stuart , et al
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/11]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
Former [2016/07]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date14782400.715.01.2014
[2016/07]
WO2014JP00153
Priority number, dateJP2013008330711.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013083307
[2016/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014167757
Date:16.10.2014
Language:JA
[2014/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2985262
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2985262
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/107, B01J20/26, B01J20/34, C01B33/04, B01J49/00, B01J41/08, B01J41/04, B01J49/57, B01J41/09, B01J41/07
[2017/13]
Former International [2017/01]C01B33/107, B01J20/26, B01J20/34, C01B33/04, B01J49/00, B01J41/08, B01J41/04
Former International [2016/07]C01B33/107, B01J20/26, B01J20/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINER SILANVERBINDUNG ODER CHLORSILANVERBINDUNG[2018/11]
English:METHOD FOR PURIFYING SILANE COMPOUND OR CHLOROSILANE COMPOUND[2018/11]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE COMPOSÉ SILANE OU DE COMPOSÉ CHLOROSILANE[2018/11]
Former [2016/07]VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINER SILANVERBINDUNG ODER CHLORSILANVERBINDUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYKRISTALLINEM SILICIUM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERIERUNG EINES SCHWACH BASISCHEN IONENAUSTAUSCHHARZES
Former [2016/07]METHOD FOR PURIFYING SILANE COMPOUND OR CHLOROSILANE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON, AND METHOD FOR REGENERATING WEAKLY BASIC ION-EXCHANGE RESIN
Former [2016/07]PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE COMPOSÉ SILANE OU DE COMPOSÉ CHLOROSILANE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SILICIUM POLYCRISTALLIN ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGÉNÉRATION DE RÉSINE ÉCHANGEUSE D'IONS FAIBLEMENT BASIQUE
Entry into regional phase14.08.2015Translation filed 
14.08.2015National basic fee paid 
14.08.2015Search fee paid 
14.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/07]
25.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2019Fee for grant paid
31.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17196935.5  / EP3296261
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2018
Opposition(s)16.12.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.03.2019
AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/04]AL13.03.2019
AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/03]AL13.03.2019
AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/51]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2471740  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0018]; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US2877097  (WOLFF GUENTER A) [AD] 1-5 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2011006697  (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]; MUEH EKKEHARD [DE]; RAULEDER HARTWIG [DE]; M) [A] 1-5 * example 1.6 *;
 [A]EP2371765  (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0021] , [ 0024] *;
 [A]RU2394762  (OOO INST PROEKT PROIZV ORCH SI [RU]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [XI]US3928542  (BAKAY CARL JAMES) [X] 6,7,9 * column 2, line 64 - line 65; examples 1, 2 * * column 1, lines 59-63 * [I] 8;
 [XI]JPS59173182  (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [X] 6 * claims 1,3,5 * [I] 7-9
International search[A]WO2011024276  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]US2877097  (GUENTER A. WOLFF);
 [A]US3414603  (ABRAHAM I. MLAVSKY);
 [A]JPS59173182  (KURITA WATER INDUSTRIES LTD.;);
 [A]WO2010074301  (TOKUYAMA CORP.)
ExaminationDE102008002537
 DE1906197
by applicantJP2012153547
 JPH02208217
 JPH09169514
 JPS6036318
 WO2011024276
 US2877097
 US3414603