Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2988410

EP2988410 - POWER GENERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.02.2018  [2018/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd.
11-2, Tsurumaki 2-chome
Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
[2016/08]
Inventor(s)01 / FURUKAWA, Kenichi
c/o MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
11-2 Tsurumaki 2-chome
Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
02 / NUMAKUNAI, Takayuki
c/o MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
11-2 Tsurumaki 2-chome
Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/08]Solf, Annkathrin
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date14783493.126.03.2014
[2016/08]
WO2014JP58591
Priority number, dateJP2013008422112.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013084221
[2016/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014168007
Date:16.10.2014
Language:JA
[2014/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2988410
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02N2/00, H01L41/12
[2017/08]
Former International [2016/08]H02N2/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
TitleGerman:STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/08]
English:POWER GENERATION DEVICE[2016/08]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ[2016/08]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2015Translation filed 
02.11.2015National basic fee paid 
02.11.2015Search fee paid 
02.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/08]
22.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/07]
26.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2005230973  (FRIPP MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0075]; figure 8 * [A] 3,6,8-15;
 [A]US6272916  (TANIGUCHI RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15
International search[A]WO2011158473  (UNIV KANAZAWA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2012161238  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK);
 [XE]JP2014096924  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO);
 [XP]JP2013208029  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO)
by applicantWO2011158473