Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3050333

EP3050333 - ON-DEMAND, REQUEST-RESPONSE BASED DISCOVERY IN PEER-TO-PEER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.06.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/31]
Inventor(s)01 / GULATI, Kapil
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / PATIL, Shailesh
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / TAVILDAR, Saurabha Rangrao
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / SADIQ, Bilal
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/48]
Former [2016/31]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14783944.322.09.2014
[2016/31]
WO2014US56815
Priority number, dateUS20131403873526.09.2013         Original published format: US201314038735
[2016/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015047957
Date:02.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3050333
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015
[2016/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3050333
Date:29.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/00
[2016/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUF ANFRAGENANTWORTEN BASIERENDE ON-DEMAND-ERKENNUNG IN PEER-TO-PEER-NETZWERKEN[2016/31]
English:ON-DEMAND, REQUEST-RESPONSE BASED DISCOVERY IN PEER-TO-PEER NETWORKS[2016/31]
French:DÉCOUVERTE À LA DEMANDE PAR DEMANDE/RÉPONSE DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE POSTE À POSTE[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2016National basic fee paid 
17.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
10.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2017Fee for grant paid
17.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)30.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2018/52]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/34]AT29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/23]AT29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
NO28.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2011103264  (WENTINK MAARTEN MENZO [NL]) [X] 1,12,23,24,34,35 * paragraphs [0010] , [0039] , [0051] , [0071] * * paragraphs [0110] , [0111] , [0112] , [0119] , [0120] , [0121] , [0122] , [0127] * * paragraphs [0134] , [0139] , [0140] * [Y] 2-4,9-11,13-15,20-22,24-26,31-33 [I] 5-8,16-19,27-30;
 [IY]US2012011247  (MALLIK SIDDHARTHA [US] ET AL) [I] 5-8,16-19,27-30 * paragraphs [0059] - [0062] - [0066] - [0068] * [Y] 2-4,9-11,13-15,20-22,24-26,31-33;
 [Y]US2013172036  (MIKLOS GYOERGY [HU] ET AL) [Y] 9-11,20-22,31-33 * paragraphs [0148] , [0153] , [0160] *