Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2987042

EP2987042 - CONTROLLING AN HVAC SYSTEM DURING DEMAND RESPONSE EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/33]
Former [2017/45]For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2016/08]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUOKA, Yoky
900 Hansen Way
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
02 / MALHOTRA, Mark
900 Hansen Way
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
03 / MINICH, Allen, J.
900 Hansen Way
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
04 / STEFANSKI, Mark, D.
900 Hansen Way
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2016/08]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date14784686.915.04.2014
[2016/08]
WO2014US34213
Priority number, dateUS20131386663519.04.2013         Original published format: US201313866635
[2016/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014172374
Date:23.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2987042
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014
[2016/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2987042
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/20, F24F11/62, F24F11/30, // G05D23/19, F24F11/00, F24F140/60, F24F120/20
[2019/12]
Former International [2016/52]G05D23/20, // G05D23/19, F24F11/00
Former International [2016/08]G05D23/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REGELUNG EINES HLK-SYSTEMS WÄHREND ANFORDERUNGSANTWORTEREIGNISSEN[2016/08]
English:CONTROLLING AN HVAC SYSTEM DURING DEMAND RESPONSE EVENTS[2016/08]
French:COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME CVCA AU COURS D'ÉVÉNEMENTS DE RÉPONSE À UNE DEMANDE[2016/08]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2015National basic fee paid 
16.11.2015Search fee paid 
16.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/08]
16.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2019Fee for grant paid
03.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19190708.8
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2012065805  (MONTALVO REY [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,11 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0074]; figure 1 and 3 * * paragraph [0082]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0103]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0129]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0139]; figures 2, 7 and 8 * * paragraph [0206] * [Y] 2-4,7,12,14,15 [I] 10,13;
 [Y]US2011184565  (PETERSON JEREMY [US]) [Y] 2,12 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064]; figures 17, 19 and 20 *;
 [Y]EP2407837  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US2007045431  (CHAPMAN JOHN G JR [US], et al) [Y] 7,15 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0046] *;
 [Y]US2011046792  (IMES KEVIN R [US], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 and 2 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0067] *;
 [A]US2012259469  (WARD JOHN [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063]; figure 1 and 9 * * paragraph [0118] *
International search[X]US2012065805  (MONTALVO REY [US]);
 [Y]US2011184565  (PETERSON JEREMY [US]);
 [Y]US2012118989  (BUESCHER THOMAS P [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007045431  (CHAPMAN JOHN G JR [US], et al);
 [Y]US2012101648  (FEDERSPIEL CLIFFORD C [US], et al)
by applicantUS2012065805
 US2011184565
 EP2407837
 US2007045431
 US2011046792