Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2987281

EP2987281 - GATEWAY DEVICE FOR MACHINE-TO-MACHINE COMMUNICATION WITH DUAL CELLULAR INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYSTECH CORPORATION
10908 Technology Place
San Diego, California 92127 / US
[2016/08]
Inventor(s)01 / RUCKER, Jeff
c/o Systech Corporation
10908 Technology Place
San Diego, California 92127 / US
02 / ARMERDING, Donald G.
c/o Systech Corporation
10908 Technology Place
San Diego, California 92127 / US
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2016/08]Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date14786025.817.04.2014
[2016/08]
WO2014US34548
Priority number, dateUS201361813066P17.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361813066 P
[2016/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014172567
Date:23.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2987281
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014
[2016/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/66
[2016/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
TitleGerman:GATEWAY-VORRICHTUNG FÜR D2D-KOMMUNIKATION MIT ZWEI FUNKSCHNITTSTELLEN[2016/08]
English:GATEWAY DEVICE FOR MACHINE-TO-MACHINE COMMUNICATION WITH DUAL CELLULAR INTERFACES[2016/08]
French:DISPOSITIFS DE PASSERELLE POUR UNE COMMUNICATION DE MACHINE A MACHINE AVEC DES INTERFACES CELLULAIRES DOUBLES[2016/08]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2015National basic fee paid 
08.10.2015Search fee paid 
08.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/08]
09.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2004008693  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 4, line 6 - line 30 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 2 * * page 11, line 15 - line 18 * * page 12, line 14 - line 32 *;
 [A]FR2929067  (NEUF CEGETEL SA [FR]) [A] 6,7,14,15 * page 7; claim 1 *
 [A]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Service requirements for Home Node B (HNB) and Home eNode B (HeNB) (3GPP TS 22.220 version 10.7.0 Release 10)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110701), vol. 3GPP SA 1, no. V10.7.0, XP014065776 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [5.3.access.control.requirements] *
International search[Y]KR20020076108  (DIGINICS INC [KR]);
 [Y]US2010142368  (GUNUKULA NAVEEN [US], et al);
 [A]US2010097925  (BELL JON A [US]);
 [A]US2012195311  (GUPTA ANUBHAV [US], et al);
 [A]US8203934  (SAVAGE DONNIE V [US], et al)