Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2987281


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.09.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.06.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.02.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.02.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.10.2017 First examination report
01.08.2017 Change - representative
18.05.2017 Amendment by applicant
02.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.10.2016 Supplementary search report published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
21.10.2016 Change - classification published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
24.06.2016 Change - extension states published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
30.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
22.01.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
22.01.2016 Request for examination filed published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
18.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
09.10.2015 Change - representative
09.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication