Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2987281 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480029044 CN201910548610 EP14786025



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019159046Global Dossier 23.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
US201715627206 19.06.2017
US201615046876 18.02.2016
US201414255827 17.04.2014
US201916257548 25.01.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10194340Global Dossier 29.01.2019B2
US2017295506 12.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
US201715627206 19.06.2017
US201615046876 18.02.2016
US201414255827 17.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9686184Global Dossier 20.06.2017B2
US2016164777 09.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
US201615046876 18.02.2016
US201414255827 17.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9307344Global Dossier 05.04.2016B2
US2014313882 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
US201414255827 17.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN110267237Global Dossier 20.09.2019A
Priority number Date
CN201480029044 17.04.2014
US201361813066 17.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105247819BGlobal Dossier 16.07.2019B
CN105247819 13.01.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
WO2014US34548 17.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2884013Global Dossier 27.09.2016C
CA2884013 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
WO2014US34548 17.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2987281Global Dossier 23.11.2016A4
EP2987281 24.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
WO2014US34548 17.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2937578 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013
CA2884013 17.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014172567Global Dossier 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361813066 17.04.2013