EP3046520 - DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crawford Healthcare Ltd. King Edward Court King Edward Road Knutsford, Cheshire WA16 0BE / GB | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHENSON, Christian 2 Dean Drive Wilmslow Cheshire SK9 2EP / GB | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Finnie, Isobel Lara Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 14786137.1 | 19.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014EP70030 | Priority number, date | GB20130016749 | 20.09.2013 Original published format: GB 201316749 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015040177 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046520 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61F13/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
A61F13/01 (EP);
A61F13/0206 (EP);
A61F13/0209 (EP);
A61F13/0223 (EP);
A61F13/0226 (EP);
A61F2013/00089 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG | [2016/30] | English: | DEVICE | [2016/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 17.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008132820 (BUCKMAN ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * paragraphs [0066] - [0093]; figures 7-15 *; | [X]WO2009067169 (MJD INNOVATIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1-44 * page 8, line 5 - page 11, line 18; figure - *; | [X]US2012238933 (MURPHY THOMAS S [US], et al) [X] 1-44* paragraphs [0030] - [0040] - [0059] - [0063]; figure - * | Examination | US3122141 | DE2738028 | WO2015013093 | WO2015032817 |