Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3054812

EP3054812 - PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR MOVABLE FURNITURE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2016/33]
Inventor(s)01 / KÄTHLER, Andreas
Tännesberger Weg 9
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
02 / MEYER, Bernd
Auf dem Sande 63
32469 Petershagen / DE
 [2016/33]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14786144.701.10.2014
[2016/33]
WO2014EP71000
Priority number, dateDE20131011107607.10.2013         Original published format: DE102013111076
[2016/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015052047
Date:16.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3054812
Date:17.08.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015
[2016/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3054812
Date:25.07.2018
Language:DE
[2018/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/493
[2018/11]
Former International [2016/33]A47B88/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG FÜR BEWEGBARE MÖBELTEILE[2016/33]
English:PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR MOVABLE FURNITURE PARTS[2016/33]
French:GUIDE D'EXTRACTION POUR ÉLÉMENTS DE MEUBLES MOBILES[2016/33]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2016National basic fee paid 
13.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
23.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2018Fee for grant paid
15.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
LU01.10.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/28]AL25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AL25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/11]FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/10]FI25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
NO25.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL25.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1066773  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,10,11 * figure 8 * [I] 4,5,8,9;
 [XDI]DE4204067  (GRASS AG [AT]) [XD] 1,2,7,10,11 * figures 4-6 * [I] 8,9;
 [A]DE202009004867U  (SUN CHAIN METAL INDUSTRY CO LT [TW]) [A] 1,3,4,7 * figure 5 *;
 [A]DE202009003883U  (KING SLIDE WORKS CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1 * figures 1-2 *
ExaminationCN102273834