Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3052483

EP3052483 - COMPOUNDS FOR AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/32]COMPOUNDS FOR AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY AND FOR EXTENDING THE HALF-LIFE OF A THERAPEUTIC AGENT
[2018/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
13.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2016/32]
Inventor(s)01 / KUMPALUME, Peter
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / SCHON, Oliver
315 Cambridge Science Park
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
03 / DONAHUE, Christine Patricia
830 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US
04 / EVINDAR, Ghotas
830 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US
05 / ISRAEL, David I.
117 Anson Road
Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US
06 / PAOLELLA, David
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
07 / KUAI, Letian
830 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US
08 / PRABHU, Ninad V.
830 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US
 [2016/32]
Representative(s)Chiappinelli, Susan Ann , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2019/06]
Former [2016/32]Povey, Alexander W.G.
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date14786355.901.10.2014
[2016/32]
WO2014IB64998
Priority number, dateUS201361885146P01.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361885146 P
US201462025994P17.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462025994 P
[2016/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015049651
Date:09.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3052483
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015
[2016/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3052483
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/10, A61K47/22, A61K31/4184, B01D15/38
[2018/45]
Former International [2016/32]C07D401/06, C07D401/10, C07D235/18, C07D235/24, C07D417/14, A61K31/4184, A61K47/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/32]
Extension statesBA18.04.2016
ME18.04.2016
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN FÜR AFFINITÄTSCHROMATOGRAFIE[2018/45]
English:COMPOUNDS FOR AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY[2018/45]
French:COMPOSÉS POUR CHROMATOGRAPHE D'AFFINITÉ, DESTINÉS À PROLONGER LA DEMI-VIE D'UN AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE[2016/32]
Former [2016/32]VERBINDUNGEN FÜR AFFINITÄTSCHROMATOGRAFIE UND ZUR VERLÄNGERUNG DER HALBWERTZEIT EINES THERAPEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFES
Former [2016/32]COMPOUNDS FOR AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY AND FOR EXTENDING THE HALF-LIFE OF A THERAPEUTIC AGENT
Entry into regional phase18.04.2016National basic fee paid 
18.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/32]
13.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2018Fee for grant paid
17.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.02.2019
AT06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
PL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
PL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/51]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004012736  (GENESOFT PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; BURLI ROLAND W [US]; BAIRD ELDON E) [X] 1,2,20 * claims 10,11 *;
 [X]WO2012017021  (GRAFFINITY PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE]; BITTERMANN HOLGER [DE]; BURKERT) [X] 1,2,20,22-27 * compound L14 *;
 [AD]WO2012020080  (GRAFFINITY PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE]; BITTERMANN HOLGER [DE]; BURKERT) [AD] 1-27 * examples;; claim 1 *
 [X]  - SHINSUKE SANDO ET AL, "Transcription monitoring using fused RNA with a dye-binding light-up aptamer as a tag: a blue fluorescent RNA", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20080101), no. 33, doi:10.1039/b808449a, ISSN 1359-7345, page 3858, XP055152722 [X] 1,2,20 * figure 1; compounds 1a, 1b and 1c *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b808449a
 [X]  - HANS FRISCHKORN ET AL, "Naphthylendi(heteroarene), III. Synthese und spektroskopisches Verhalten von 2,2'-Naphthylendibenzazolen", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, (19840612), vol. 1984, no. 6, doi:10.1002/jlac.198419840610, ISSN 0170-2041, pages 1129 - 1136, XP055152662 [X] 1,2,20 * table 1; compound c' *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlac.198419840610
 [X]  - MADHURI DASARI ET AL, "Hoechst-IR: An Imaging Agent That Detects Necrotic Tissue in Vivo by Binding Extracellular DNA", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20100806), vol. 12, no. 15, doi:10.1021/ol100923d, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 3300 - 3303, XP055092139 [X] 1,2,20 * compound 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol100923d
 [X]  - ROB HOEN ET AL, "Selective Inhibition of an Apicoplastic Aminoacyl-tRNA Synthetase from Plasmodium falciparum", CHEMBIOCHEM, (20130304), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1002/cbic.201200620, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 499 - 509, XP055152868 [X] 10,20 * scheme 1 and table 1; scheme 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.201200620
 [X]  - A. O. H. EL-NEZHAWY ET AL, "Synthesis and analgesic activity of (2,3-diphenyl-1H-indol-5-YL)piperazin-1-yl methanone derivatives", PHARMACEUTICAL CHEMISTRY JOURNAL, (20090101), vol. 43, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s11094-009-0234-y, ISSN 0091-150X, pages 25 - 29, XP055152870 [X] 10,16,20,21 * scheme 2;; compound 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11094-009-0234-y
 [AD]  - LISA POLLARO ET AL, "Strategies to prolong the plasma residence time of peptide drugs", vol. 1, no. 5, doi:10.1039/C0MD00111B, ISSN 2040-2503, (20101201), pages 319 - 324, MEDCHEMCOMM, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, UNITED KINGDOM, URL: http://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/2010/md/c0md00111b?page=search, (20101021), XP002632706 [AD] 1-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C0MD00111B
by applicantUS4722896
 US5849874
 WO2012020080
 WO2011012715
 WO03084469
 WO2012140647
 WO2014106583
    - S. SUBRAMANIAN, "Dye-Ligand Affinity Chromatography: The Interaction of Cibacron Blue F3GAO With Proteins and Enzymes", CRC CRITICAL REVIEWS IN BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 169 - 205
    - L. POLLARO; C. HEINIS, "Strategoes to Prolong the Plasma Residence Time of Peptide Drugs", MED. CHEM. COMMUN., (2010), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1039/C0MD00111B, pages 319 - 324, XP002632706

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C0MD00111B