Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3055724

EP3055724 - MODULAR BREAK-OUT FOR CABLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2016/33]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MULFINGER, Robert Neil
40 Markley Drive
York Haven, Pennsylvania 17370 / US
02 / BURKHOLDER, Matthew Lynn
821 Red Coat Road
Collegeville, PA 19426 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/33]01 / MULFINGER, Robert Neil
40 Markley Drive
York Haven, Pennsylvania 17370 / US
02 / BURKHOLDER, Matthew Lynn
214 Reifsnyder Road
Lititz, Pennsylvania 17543 / US
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2016/33]
Application number, filing date14786575.207.10.2014
[2016/33]
WO2014US59455
Priority number, dateUS201361887685P07.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361887685 P
US20141450698506.10.2014         Original published format: US201414506985
[2016/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015054221
Date:16.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3055724
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2016/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
TitleGerman:MODULARE KABELPEITSCHENANORDNUNG[2016/33]
English:MODULAR BREAK-OUT FOR CABLE ASSEMBLY[2016/33]
French:INTERFACE MODULAIRE POUR ENSEMBLE CÂBLE[2016/33]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2016National basic fee paid 
03.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
25.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010052677  (RAYCHEM SHANGHAI CABLE ACCESSO [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,9,13-15,17-19 * the whole document * [Y] 10-12 [I] 3-8,16,20;
 [X]GB2438654  (SPLICE UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4603942  (CHANG YU-WEN [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * abstract *