Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3055997

EP3055997 - COMBINED SCALABILITY PROCESSING FOR MULTI-LAYER VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VID SCALE, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300
Wilmington DE 19809 / US
[2016/33]
Inventor(s)01 / YE, Yan
5001 Pearlman Way
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / DONG, Jie
7785 Goldfish Way
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
03 / HE, Yuwen
13542 Silver Vine Path
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
04 / NEFF, Ralph
11438 Honey Ridge
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
 [2016/33]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2019/49]
Former [2016/33]Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date14789458.807.10.2014
[2016/33]
WO2014US59560
Priority number, dateUS201361887782P07.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361887782 P
US201462045495P03.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462045495 P
[2016/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2015054307
Date:16.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3055997
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015
[2016/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3055997
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/30, H04N19/186
[2016/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTE SKALIERBARKEITSVERARBEITUNG FÜR MEHRSCHICHTIGE VIDEOCODIERUNG[2016/33]
English:COMBINED SCALABILITY PROCESSING FOR MULTI-LAYER VIDEO CODING[2016/33]
French:TRAITEMENT D'ÉCHELONNABILITÉ COMBINÉ PERMETTANT UN CODAGE VIDÉO MULTICOUCHE[2016/33]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2016National basic fee paid 
04.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
13.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.05.2019
02.05.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2019Fee for grant paid
19.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19208604.9
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]  - PHILIPPE BORDES ET AL, "AHG14: Color Gamut Scalable Video Coding using 3D LUT", 13. JCT-VC MEETING; 104. MPEG MEETING; 18-4-2013 - 26-4-2013; INCHEON; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20130408), no. JCTVC-M0197, XP030114154 [I] 1-5,10-14 * the whole document *
 [I]  - ANDREW SEGALL ET AL, "HEVC Scalable Extensions Core Experiment 4 (SCE4): Color Gamut and Bit-Depth Scalability", 14. JCT-VC MEETING; 25-7-2013 - 2-8-2013; VIENNA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20130928), no. JCTVC-N1104, XP030114963 [I] 1-5,10-14 * the whole document *
 [I]  - BORDES P ET AL, "AHG14: Color Gamut Scalable Video Coding using 3D LUT: New Results", 14. JCT-VC MEETING; 25-7-2013 - 2-8-2013; VIENNA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20130724), no. JCTVC-N0168-v3, XP030114646 [I] 1-5,10-14 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2009110073
 US2010046612