Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3068816

EP3068816 - A NON-AQUEOUS CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITON, A METHOD TO PRODUCE SAME AND COATINGS AND ARTICLES COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies Llc
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / FOLEY, Paul
1414 Nelson Road
Traverse City, MI 49686 / US
02 / ARGYROPOULOS, John N.
501 Nakoma Drive
Nidland, MI 48640 / US
03 / HE, Yiyong
316 Broadhead Drive
Midland, MI 48642 / US
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/37]Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2016/38]Mauro, Marina Eliana
Murgitroyd & Company
Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14789730.014.10.2014
[2016/38]
WO2014US60364
Priority number, dateUS201361903494P13.11.2013         Original published format: US 201361903494 P
[2016/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015073151
Date:21.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3068816
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015
[2016/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3068816
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08G12/02, C09D161/24, C08G65/333, C08G12/46, C09D161/22
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NICHTWÄSSRIGE VERNETZBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON SOWIE BESCHICHTUNGEN UND ARTIKEL DAMIT[2016/38]
English:A NON-AQUEOUS CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITON, A METHOD TO PRODUCE SAME AND COATINGS AND ARTICLES COMPRISING THE SAME[2016/38]
French:COMPOSITION RÉTICULABLE NON AQUEUSE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET REVÊTEMENTS ET ARTICLES LA COMPRENANT[2016/38]
Entry into regional phase18.05.2016National basic fee paid 
18.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/38]
21.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2019Fee for grant paid
31.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2400016  (MEYER LEONARD S) [X] 1,4,7,8,10-16 * Example, from page 3, right column, line 58 to page 4, left column, line 3 * * Page 1, right column, line 44 to page 2, left column, line 9 * * Page 2, right column, lines 21-29 * * Page 2, last two lines to page 3, left column, line 6 * [I] 2,3;
 [XI]US4855394  (GOECKEL ULRICH [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,4-16 * examples 1, 4, 5, 7, 9 * * Use Example 1 * [I] 2,3;
 [XI]US4160754  (SCHAPEL DIETMAR ET AL) [X] 11,15,16 * examples 1, 6 * [I] 1-10
ExaminationUS2013165581