Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3047256

EP3047256 - MEASURING CUVETTE FOR SPECTROMETRIC MEASURING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olythe
240, Rue Louis de Broglie
Les Méridiens Bâtiment B
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
[2018/34]
Former [2016/30]For all designated states
Olythe
65 Rue Louis de Broglie
13857 Aix en Provence / FR
Inventor(s)01 / NESA, Guillaume
315 Chemin de la Croix Verte
La Comédia C07
F-13090 Aix en Provence / FR
02 / DUBOIS, Grégory
5, Rue Pauline Kreuscher
Residence Le Clos de la Foret
78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
03 / FLESCH, Etienne
97 Rue du Général Leclerc
F-78570 Andresy / FR
04 / PAFUMI, Lionel
11 Allée Philippe Brocard
F-13127 Vitrolles / FR
05 / THIERRY, Jean-Pierre
58bis Rue Charles Infroit
F-78570 Andresy / FR
 [2018/15]
Former [2016/30]01 / NESA, Guillaume
315 Chemin de la Croix Verte
La Comédia C07
F-13090 Aix en Provence / FR
02 / DUBOIS, Grégory
83 Rue des Côtes
F-78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
03 / FLESCH, Etienne
97 Rue du Général Leclerc
F-78570 Andresy / FR
04 / PAFUMI, Lionel
11 Allée Philippe Brocard
F-13127 Vitrolles / FR
05 / THIERRY, Jean-Pierre
58bis Rue Charles Infroit
F-78570 Andresy / FR
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2018/15]
Former [2016/30]Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
Application number, filing date14790195.318.09.2014
[2016/30]
WO2014FR52320
Priority number, dateFR2013005897418.09.2013         Original published format: FR 1358974
[2016/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015040330
Date:26.03.2015
Language:FR
[2015/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3047256
Date:27.07.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015
[2016/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3047256
Date:11.04.2018
Language:FR
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/03, G01N21/05, G01N21/3504, G01N33/497
[2016/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MESSKÜVETTE FÜR EIN SPEKTROMETRISCHES MESSINSTRUMENT[2016/30]
English:MEASURING CUVETTE FOR SPECTROMETRIC MEASURING INSTRUMENT[2016/30]
French:CUVE DE MESURE POUR APPAREIL DE MESURE PAR SPECTROMETRIE[2016/30]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2016National basic fee paid 
18.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
14.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.02.2018Fee for grant paid
28.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
LU18.09.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP1306661  (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]GB2392976  (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 4 *;
 [A]DE3942325  (ROSEMOUNT GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 40 * * column 3, line 46 - line 64 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JP2012177690  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [AD]FR2941530  (S SERES ENVIRONNEMENT SA [FR]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2941530
 EP1306661