Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3057563

EP3057563 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION WITH INCREASED OPACITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever NV
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
[2016/34]
Inventor(s)01 / HUDELIST, Florian
Kranichweg 57
69123 Heidelberg / DE
02 / LI, Yajuan
Unilever (China) Investing Company
No. 66 LinXin Road
Linkong Economic
Development Zone, Changning District
Shanghai 200335 / CN
03 / LIU, Zhaoting
Room 402
No.5 Lane 248 Guanglan Road
Shanghai 200120 / CN
04 / MENG, Sheng
Unilever (China) Investing Company
66 LinXin Road
Linkong Economic Development Zone
Changning District
Shanghai 200335 / CN
05 / QIU, Qiang
Conopco Inc.
d/b/a UNILEVER
40 Merritt Boulevard
Trumbull
Connecticut 06611 / US
06 / WANG, Lin
Unilever (China) Investing Company
No. 66 LinXin Road
Linkong Economic Development Zone
Changning District
Shanghai 200335 / CN
07 / WANG, Xiaoli
Unilever (China) Investing Company
No. 66 LinXin Road
Linkong Economic Development Zone
Changning District
Shanghai 200335 / CN
08 / WU, Chunwei
6153 Kauffman Avenue
Temple City, California 91780 / US
 [2016/34]
Representative(s)Corsten, Michael Allan
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2016/34]Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date14790531.909.10.2014
[2016/34]
WO2014EP71627
Priority number, dateWO2013CN8521715.10.2013         Original published format: PCT/CN2013/085217
EP2013019488028.11.2013         Original published format: EP 13194880
[2016/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015055494
Date:23.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3057563
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2015
[2016/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/25, A61K8/81, A61K8/02, A61K8/11, A61Q1/02, A61K8/19
[2016/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/34]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ERHÖHTER OPAZITÄT[2016/34]
English:COSMETIC COMPOSITION WITH INCREASED OPACITY[2016/34]
French:COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE À OPACITÉ ACCRUE[2016/34]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2016National basic fee paid 
14.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/34]
24.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2011076518  (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 4 - page 10, line 3 * * page 10, line 6 - line 23 * * page 13, line 6 - line 10 * * page 23; example 2 * * page 25; table 1 * * page 21, line 12 - line 22 * [Y] 10,13 [I] 1-15;
 [XY]WO2004105712  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 15 * page 1, line 10 - line 14 * * page 6, line 10 - line 20 * * page 40; example 6b * * page 31; example 1a * * page 32; example 5a * * page 24, line 12 - line 16 * [Y] 10,13;
 [A]EP2500087  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0044] , [0048] , [0050] , [0092] , [0062] , [0015] * * page 11; example 2 * * page 14 - page 15; examples 6-7 * * figures 1c, 1d *;
 [AD]US7758888  (LAPIDOT NOA [IL], et al) [AD] 1-15 * examples 1-10; claims 8, 12 *;
 [A]WO2008079760  (AVON PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15