Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3050133

EP3050133 - FREQUENCY DEPENDENT LIGHT EMITTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.01.2020
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wake Forest University
391 Technology Way, Suite 199
Winston-Salem, NC 27101 / US
[2016/31]
Inventor(s)01 / CARROLL, David
5173 Laurel View Drive
Winston-Salem, NC 27104 / US
02 / SUMMERS, Robert
577 Drumheller Road
Clemmons, NC 27012 / US
03 / CHEN, Yonghua
2119 Lennox Road Apt. 8
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Phillips & Leigh LLP
Temple Chambers
3-7 Temple Avenue
London EC4Y 0DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/31]Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date14790828.926.09.2014
[2016/31]
WO2014US57774
Priority number, dateUS201361883710P27.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361883710 P
[2016/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015048486
Date:02.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3050133
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015
[2016/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/50, H01L51/54
[2019/47]
Former International [2016/31]H01L51/00, H01L51/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
TitleGerman:FREQUENZABHÄNGIGE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNGEN[2016/31]
English:FREQUENCY DEPENDENT LIGHT EMITTING DEVICES[2016/31]
French:DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTS DÉPENDANT DE LA FRÉQUENCE[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2016National basic fee paid 
31.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
11.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.10.2019
21.10.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.03.2018Request for further processing filed
13.03.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.03.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2013240847  (ZAKHIDOV ANVAR A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15,17,21,22 * paragraphs [0040] , [0042] * [Y] 5-14,16,26 [I] 18-20,23,24;
 [XY]WO2013112298  (UNIV WAKE FOREST [US]) [X] 25 * the whole document * [Y] 5-14,16,26
 [XYI]  - DO NGOE CHUNG ET AL, "Investigation of Polymeric Composite Films Using Modified TiO2 Nanoparticles for Organic Light Emitting Diodes", CURRENT NANOSCIENCE, NL, (20130101), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1573-4137, pages 14 - 20, XP055124381 [X] 1-4,15,17 * the whole document * [Y] 5-14,16 [I] 18-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/157341313805118018
 [XYI]  - PHUONG HOAI ET AL, "Improved performances in light-emitting diodes based on a semiconductor TiO 2 nano cluster buffer layer Improved performances in light-emitting diodes based on a semiconductor TiO 2 nano cluster buffer layer", ADV. NAT. SCI.: NANOSCI. NANOTECHNOL., (20130430), vol. 4, doi:10.1088/2043-6262/4/2/025013, pages 25013 - 1, XP055157937 [X] 1-4,15,17 * the whole document * [Y] 5-14,16 [I] 18-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/2043-6262/4/2/025013
by applicantWO2012009344
    - AIMSEN ET AL., "Synthesis and Electroluminescence Properties of Polyfluorene Deriatives for Light-Emitting Diodes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2010 5TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NANO/MICRO ENGINEERED AND MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, pages 21 - 25