Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3050133 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3050133



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1068
15.01.2020 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.01.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.01.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.01.2020 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
15.01.2020 Text intended for grant Search / examination 99
15.01.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 99
18.10.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.10.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
10.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 96
10.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
10.10.2019 Description Search / examination 89
10.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.10.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.10.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.10.2019 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.10.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.09.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 96
18.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
18.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
18.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
18.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
18.09.2019 Description Search / examination 90
18.09.2019 Drawings Search / examination 1
18.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.09.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
10.06.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.05.2019 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
26.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
26.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
04.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
04.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.09.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
24.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.05.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.03.2018 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.03.2018 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
12.01.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
28.09.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
22.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.09.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.05.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.03.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.11.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
11.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.07.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.05.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
21.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.02.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.04.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 109
02.04.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
02.04.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 105
22.01.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
18.12.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.12.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.12.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.10.2014 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.10.2014 Annex International Searching Authority 3
10.10.2014 Claims International Searching Authority 4
10.10.2014 Description International Searching Authority 95
10.10.2014 Drawings International Searching Authority 4