Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3050133


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.01.2020 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.10.2019 Change - classification published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
18.10.2019 Change - classification published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
15.10.2019 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
01.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.09.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.06.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.03.2018 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
16.03.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.03.2018 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
16.03.2018 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
11.01.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.09.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.06.2017 First examination report
02.12.2016 Change - extension states published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
18.11.2016 Amendment by applicant
30.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.07.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
01.07.2016 Request for examination filed published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
14.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
06.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2016 Change - representative
22.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
11.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
07.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication