Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3050133 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480065216 EP14790828



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10121993Global Dossier 06.11.2018B2
US2018190945 05.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013
US201615024624 24.03.2016
US201815904569 26.02.2018
WO2014US57774 26.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9905810Global Dossier 27.02.2018B2
US2016240821 18.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013
WO2014US57774 26.09.2014
US201415024624 26.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160062111Global Dossier 01.06.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013
WO2014US57774 26.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2016532246Global Dossier 13.10.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013
WO2014US57774 26.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105794009BGlobal Dossier 19.02.2019B
CN105794009 20.07.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013
WO2014US57774 26.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3050133Global Dossier 03.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013
WO2014US57774 26.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2925303 02.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013
WO2014US57774 26.09.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015048486Global Dossier 02.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361883710 27.09.2013