blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2992148

EP2992148 - SYSTEM FOR FORMING A STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/10]APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING A STRUCTURE
[2020/27]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.10.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.11.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.07.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prodaniuk, Gary
P.O. Box 67
Redwater, Alberta T0A 2W0 / CA
[2016/10]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2016/10]
Application number, filing date14792111.802.05.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014CA50420
Priority number, dateUS20131388710503.05.2013         Original published format: US201313887105
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014176701
Date:06.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2992148
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2992148
Date:23.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA06.11.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2016
ClassificationIPC:E04C5/16, B65D88/12, B65D90/02, E04B1/35, F16B1/00, F16B9/02, B60P1/64, E04B1/34, E04C3/11, E04C3/40, F16B7/20, F16B21/02, // F16B5/06, F16B7/04, E04C3/04, E04H1/12
[2016/46]
CPC:
F16B7/20 (EP,US); E04H1/12 (US); E04C3/11 (EP,US);
E04C3/40 (EP,US); E04H1/1205 (EP,US); E04H15/02 (EP,US);
E04H15/08 (EP,US); E04H15/18 (EP,US); E04H15/36 (EP,US);
E04H15/54 (EP,US); F16B21/02 (EP,US); F16B5/06 (US);
E04B1/34 (EP,US); E04C2003/0491 (EP,US); E04H15/644 (EP,US);
E04H2001/1283 (EP,US); F16B5/0692 (EP,US); F16B7/0433 (EP,US);
Y10T403/595 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2016/10]E04C5/16, B65D88/12, B65D90/02, E04B1/35, F16B1/00, F16B9/02, B60P1/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STRUKTUR[2020/27]
English:SYSTEM FOR FORMING A STRUCTURE[2020/27]
French:SYSTEME POUR FORMER UNE STRUCTURE[2020/27]
Former [2016/10]VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STRUKTUR
Former [2016/10]APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING A STRUCTURE
Former [2016/10]APPAREIL ET SYSTEME POUR FORMER UNE STRUCTURE
Entry into regional phase24.11.2015National basic fee paid 
24.11.2015Search fee paid 
24.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
09.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2020Fee for grant paid
12.11.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.11.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)24.09.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2014
AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CY23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
MK23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE02.05.2021
LU02.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU02.05.2014
AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CY23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE02.05.2021
LU02.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2023/29]HU02.05.2014
AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE02.05.2021
LU02.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/34]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE02.05.2021
LU02.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/23]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE02.05.2021
LU02.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/21]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE02.05.2021
LU02.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/11]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
LU02.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/10]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
LU02.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
Former [2022/09]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
LU02.05.2021
Former [2022/07]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/49]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/45]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/42]AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/39]AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/37]AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/36]CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/35]CZ23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/34]CZ23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/33]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/32]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/28]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/24]FI23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/23]FI23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/22]FI23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
NO23.03.2021
Former [2021/20]FI23.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5676271  (REYNARD KENNETH [GB]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 41 - line 44 * * figures 1,3,4 *[Y] 14-17;
 [XYI]ES2230943  (PEREIRO LOPEZ-QUECUTY SIMON [ES]) [X] 1,2,4-10,13,14 * figures 1,2,3 * [Y] 14-17 [I] 3,11,12;
 [X]WO2007094692  (HABODE IP LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1,3-8 * figures 1,2,3,7,14 *;
 [XY]EP2020376  (CONTRAVES AG [CH]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2a,3,4 * [Y] 14-17
International search[X]US2010018131  (GREEN JAMES E [US]);
 [X]CN201785871U  (LIANYING LI);
 [X]AU2010212272  (PREFORM ASSETS PTY LTD [AU])
ExaminationGB2359312
by applicantES2230943
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.