Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3061216

EP3061216 - METHOD FOR AVOIDING A LOOP WHEN FORWARDING A MESSAGE, RESPECTIVE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/19]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GYSELINCK, Luc
Risschotplein 6
B-2980 Zoersel / BE
02 / VOET, Jan
Torfhoeken 9
B-2970 Schilde / BE
03 / STES, Bram
Wambachstraat 31
B-2018 Antwerpen / BE
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date14792422.917.10.2014
[2016/35]
WO2014EP72300
Priority number, dateEP2013029025624.10.2013         Original published format: EP 13290256
[2016/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015059045
Date:30.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3061216
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015
[2016/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/705
[2016/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG EINER SCHLEIFE BEIM WEITERLEITEN EINER NACHRICHT, ENTSPRECHENDE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM[2016/35]
English:METHOD FOR AVOIDING A LOOP WHEN FORWARDING A MESSAGE, RESPECTIVE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2016/35]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉVITER UNE BOUCLE LORS DU TRANSFERT D'UN MESSAGE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION RESPECTIF ET SYSTÈME[2016/35]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2016National basic fee paid 
21.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
28.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0511927  (IBM [US]) [X] 1,12-14 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 11 * * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 56; figure 7 *;
 [X]US7558210  (HOBSON STEPHEN J [GB], et al) [X] 1,12-14 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 30 *;
 [A]US2009287804  (BANKS ANDREW D [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0030] *
 [XP]  - JIA YUE ET AL, "Improved reliability of large scale publish/subscribe based MOMs using model checking", 2014 IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOMS), IEEE, (20140505), doi:10.1109/NOMS.2014.6838311, pages 1 - 8, XP032608823 [XP] 1-4 * page 6, paragraph Section C "Loop Detection" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.2014.6838311