Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3062759

EP3062759 - EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR CARE OF THE SKIN, CULTURE MEDIA AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lipotec, S.A.U
Isaac Peral 17
Polígono Industrial Camí Ral
08850 Gavà (Barcelona) / ES
[2016/36]
Inventor(s)01 / GARCÍA SANZ, M Nuria
Lipotec S.A.U
Polígono Industrial Camí Ral
Isaac Peral 17
08850 Gavà (Barcelona) / ES
02 / FERRER MONTIEL, Antonio, Vicente
Avda. Ansaldo 4
Bloque Y 2ºN Esc.3
03540 Alicante / ES
03 / SOLEY ASTALS, Albert
Lipotec S.A.U
Polígono Industrial Camí Ral
Isaac Peral 17
08850 Gavà (Barcelona) / ES
04 / ALMIÑANA DOMÉNECH, Núria
Lipotec S.A.U
Polígono Industrial Camí Ral
Isaac Peral 17
08850 Gavà (Barcelona) / ES
 [2019/33]
Former [2016/36]01 / GARCÍA SANZ, M Nuria
Lipotec S.A.U
Polígono Industrial Camí Ral
Isaac Peral 17
E-08850 Gavà (Barcelona) / ES
02 / FERRER MONTIEL, Antonio, Vicente
Avda. Ansaldo 4
Bloque Y 2ºN Esc.3
E-03540 Alicante / ES
03 / SOLEY ASTALS, Albert
Lipotec S.A.U
Polígono Industrial Camí Ral
Isaac Peral 17
E-08850 Gavà (Barcelona) / ES
04 / ALMIÑANA DOMÉNECH, Núria
Lipotec S.A.U
Polígono Industrial Camí Ral
Isaac Peral 17
E-08850 Gavà (Barcelona) / ES
Representative(s)Bradley, Josephine Mary , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
40 Torphichen Street
Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB
[2019/33]
Former [2016/36]Bradley, Josephine Mary
Marks & Clerk LLP
Atholl Exchange
6 Canning Street
Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB
Application number, filing date14792493.030.10.2014
[2016/36]
WO2014EP73401
Priority number, dateEP2013038243730.10.2013         Original published format: EP 13382437
[2016/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015063240
Date:07.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3062759
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015
[2016/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3062759
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61Q19/08, A61Q19/06
[2018/52]
Former International [2016/36]A61K8/00, A61K8/73, A61K8/99, A61K31/715, C12P1/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER PFLEGE DER HAUT, KULTURMEDIEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON[2018/52]
English:EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR CARE OF THE SKIN, CULTURE MEDIA AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF[2016/36]
French:EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU LES SOINS DE LA PEAU, MEDIA DE CULTURE ET COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT[2018/52]
Former [2016/36]EXOPOLYSACCHARID ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER ZUR PFLEGE DER HAUT, KULTURMEDIEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON
Former [2016/36]EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU LE SOIN DE LA PEAU, MILIEU DE CULTURE ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIÉES
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase05.05.2016National basic fee paid 
05.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/36]
18.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.05.2019Fee for grant paid
17.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
04.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2012072245  (LIPOTEC SA [ES]; POLYMARIS BIOTECHNOLOGY [FR]; COURTOIS ANTHONY [FR];) [Y] 6,7,11 * page 7, line 11 - page 13, line 18; claims 1,3,13,16,21,23,26 *;
 [XY]  - KAZAK H ET AL, "Exopolysaccharide production by Halomonas strains isolated from Turkey", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 131, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2007.07.888, ISSN 0168-1656, (20070901), page S163, (20070901), XP027494648 [X] 1-5,8-10,12 * abstract * [Y] 6,7,11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2007.07.888
 [Y]  - MATA J A ET AL, "Exopolysaccharides produced by the recently described halophilic bacteria Halomonas ventosae and Halomonas anticariensis", RESEARCH IN MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 157, no. 9, ISSN 0923-2508, (20061101), pages 827 - 835, (20061101), XP027954832 [Y] 6,7,11 * page 827, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 828, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 829, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 830, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 833, column 1, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - ROAYAIE ARDAKANI M ET AL, "Isolation of Moderately HalophilicProducing Extracellular Hydrolytic Enzymes from Persian Gulf", INDIAN JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY ; THE OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE ASSOCIATION OF MICROBIOLOGISTS OF INDIA, SPRINGER-VERLAG, INDIA, (20111217), vol. 52, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S12088-011-0243-X, ISSN 0973-7715, pages 94 - 98, XP035026903 [A] 1-12 * page 94, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12088-011-0243-x
by applicant   - VOGELGESANG B. ET AL., "In vitro and in vivo efficacy of sulfocarrabiose a sugar-based cosmetic INGREDIENTS with anti-cellulite properties", INT. J. COSMET. SCI., (2011), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 120 - 5
    - NAKABAYASHI H. ET AL., "Inhibitory effects of caffeine and its metabolites on intracellular lipid accumulation in murine 3T3-L1 adipocytes", BIOFACTORS, (2008), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 293 - 302
    - DUPRESSOIR A. ET AL., "Characterization of a mammalian gene related to the yeast CCR4 general transcription factor and revealed by transposon insertion", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, no. 43, pages 31068 - 75
    - DUPRESSOIR A. ET AL., "Identification of four families of yCCR4- and Mg2l -dependent endonuclease-related proteins in higher eukaryotes, and characterization of orthologs of yCCR4 with a conserved leucine-rich repeat essential for hCAF1/hPOP2 binding", BMC GENOMICS, (2001), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2164-2-9, page 9, XP021014405

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2164-2-9
    - GREEN C.B. ET AL., "Loss of Nocturnin, a circadian deadenylase, confers resistance to hepatic steatosis and diet-induced obesity", PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 23, pages 9888 - 93
    - BOIVIN D.B. ET AL., "Circadian clock genes oscillate in human peripheral blood mononuclear cells", BLOOD, (200312), vol. 102, no. 12, pages 4143 - 4145
    - GREEN C.B. ET AL., "The Meter of Metabolism", CELL, (2008), vol. 134, no. 5, pages 728 - 742
    - KAWAY M.; ROSEN C.J., "PPARy: a circadian transcription factor in adipogenesis and osteogenesis", NAT. REV. ENDOCRINOL., (2010), vol. 6, pages 629 - 636
    - MEHLING A.; FLUHR J. W., "Chronobiology: biological clocks and rhythms of the skin", SKIN PHARMACOL. PHYSIOL, (2006), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1159/000093113, pages 182 - 9, XP009505530

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000093113
    - GREEN C.B.; BESHARSE J.C., "Identification of a novel vertebrate circadian clock-regulated gene encoding the protein Nocturnin", PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 25, pages 14884 - 8
    - DUPRESSOIR A. ET AL., "Identification of four families of yCCR4- and Mg2+-dependent endonuclease-related proteins in higher eukaryotes, and characterization of orthologs of yCCR4 with a conserved leucine-rich repeat essential for hCAF1/hPOP2 binding", BMC GENOMICS, (2001), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2164-2-9, page 9, XP021014405

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2164-2-9
    - NIU S. ET AL., "The circadian deadenylase Nocturnin is necessary for stabilization of the iNOS mRNA in mice", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 11, page E269547
    - Harry's Cosmeticology, LONGMAN HOUSE
    - NELSON G., "Application of microencapsulation in textiles", INT. J. PHARM., (2002), vol. 242, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(02)00141-2, pages 55 - 62, XP002251032

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(02)00141-2
    - "Biofunctional Textiles and the Skin", HIPLER U.C.; ELSNER P., Curr. Probl. Dermatol., BASEL, (2006), vol. 33
    - MALCOLM R.K ET AL., "Controlled release of a model antibacterial drug from a novel self-lubricating silicone biomaterial", J. CONT. RELEASE, (2004), vol. 97, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.03.029, pages 313 - 320, XP004515650

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.03.029
    - KAMERLING ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1975), vol. 151, pages 491 - 495
    - MONTREUIL ET AL., Glycoproteins. In Carbohydrate analysis: a practical approach, I.R.L PRESS, (1986), pages 143 - 204
    - ROJAS ESCUDERO ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. A., (2004), vol. 1027, pages 117 - 120