Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3069470 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3069470



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 646
05.12.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.12.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.12.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.12.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 57
05.12.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 57
31.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
31.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
31.07.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
31.07.2019 Description Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.07.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.07.2019 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
24.07.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
07.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
07.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
13.11.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.12.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
20.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
20.12.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.12.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
20.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
24.08.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.06.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.06.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.2016 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
24.05.2016 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 18
08.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.04.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.04.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.03.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.02.2016 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 11
04.02.2016 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.02.2016 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
04.02.2016 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.02.2016 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.02.2016 Despatch of copy of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.02.2016 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.02.2016 Separate sheet with IPEA428 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.12.2015 Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.12.2015 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
15.12.2015 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
15.12.2015 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
20.10.2015 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.10.2015 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
20.10.2015 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.10.2015 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.09.2015 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.09.2015 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.09.2015 Notification of transmittal of demand to the competent IPEA PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.09.2015 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
25.09.2015 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
25.09.2015 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
25.09.2015 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
08.06.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 92
08.06.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 83
21.05.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.05.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 70
12.12.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
12.12.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
12.12.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
30.10.2014 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
13.10.2014 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.10.2014 Annex International Searching Authority 3
13.10.2014 Claims International Searching Authority 4
13.10.2014 Description International Searching Authority 49
13.10.2014 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
13.10.2014 Drawings International Searching Authority 15