Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3069470


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.12.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.11.2019 Change - classification published on  25.12.2019 [2019/52]
22.11.2019 Change - classification published on  25.12.2019 [2019/52]
14.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.08.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.07.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.11.2018 First examination report
10.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2017 Change - extension states published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
13.01.2017 Amendment by applicant
19.08.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
19.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.08.2016 Request for examination filed published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
04.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2016 Change - representative
08.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.05.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication