Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3069470 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480062045 EP14792921



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101732327BGlobal Dossier 02.05.2017B1
KR20160086340 19.07.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361903915 13.11.2013
WO2014US58544 01.10.2014
US201414502009 30.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6306178BGlobal Dossier 04.04.2018B2
JP2016540427 22.12.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361903915 13.11.2013
WO2014US58544 01.10.2014
US201414502009 30.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105723653BGlobal Dossier 02.08.2019B
CN105723653 29.06.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361903915 13.11.2013
WO2014US58544 01.10.2014
US201414502009 30.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3069470Global Dossier 21.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361903915 13.11.2013
WO2014US58544 01.10.2014
US201414502009 30.09.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015073130Global Dossier 21.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361903915 13.11.2013
US201414502009 30.09.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9491310Global Dossier 08.11.2016B2
US2015133081 14.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361903915 13.11.2013
US201414502009 30.09.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6495414BGlobal Dossier 03.04.2019B2
JP2018038061 08.03.2018A
Priority number Date
US201361903915 13.11.2013
US201414502009 30.09.2014