Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3069470

EP3069470 - TECHNIQUES FOR DETERMINING TRAFFIC VOLUMES SERVED OVER MULTIPLE CELLS OF A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.12.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / GRIOT, Miguel
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / MALLADI, Durga, Prasad
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / HORN, Gavin, Bernard
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/38]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14792921.001.10.2014
[2016/38]
WO2014US58544
Priority number, dateUS201361903915P13.11.2013         Original published format: US 201361903915 P
US20141450200930.09.2014         Original published format: US201414502009
[2016/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015073130
Date:21.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3069470
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/14, H04W4/24, H04M15/00
[2019/52]
Former International [2016/38]H04L12/14, H04W4/26, H04M15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG DES VERKEHRSVOLUMENS ÜBER MEHRERE ZELLEN EINES DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKS[2016/38]
English:TECHNIQUES FOR DETERMINING TRAFFIC VOLUMES SERVED OVER MULTIPLE CELLS OF A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2016/38]
French:TECHNIQUES DE DÉTERMINATION DE VOLUMES DE TRAFIC SERVI SUR DES CELLULES MULTIPLES D'UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL[2016/38]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2016National basic fee paid 
08.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/38]
20.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2013031498  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10,14,17,20,22,26 * abstract * [Y] 2,5,6,15,18,19,21,23,24,27,29,30 [I] 9,11-13,16,25,28;
 [P]US2014194093  (TSUDA SHINICHIRO [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0069] - [0072] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraphs [0090] - [0092] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraphs [0290] - [0303] *;
 [Y]US2008119160  (ANDRIANTSIFERANA LAURENT [FR], et al) [Y] 2,6,15,19,21,24,27,30 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0057] * * paragraph [0061] *;
 [Y]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Network based IP flow mobility (Release 12)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.861, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20121126), vol. SA WG2, no. V1.7.0, pages 1 - 75, XP050650426 [Y] 2,5,6,15,18,19,21,23,24,27,29,30 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [7.1.1.3] * * paragraph [7.2.2.2] * * paragraph [7.4.2.2.5] *