Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3060269

EP3060269 - CELL WASHING DEVICE USING A WAVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Biologics, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2016/35]
Inventor(s)01 / LEACH, Michael D.
2730 East Setter Lane
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / HAMMAN, Ned M.
3218 East Armstrong Road
Leesburg, Indiana 46538 / US
03 / ABESKARON, David
1221 Briar Ridge Circle
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
04 / CUNNINGHAM, Grant D.
3416 South Wildwood Trail
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/35]
Application number, filing date14793393.121.10.2014
[2016/35]
WO2014US61523
Priority number, dateUS201361893555P21.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361893555 P
US201461979695P15.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461979695 P
US201462011992P13.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462011992 P
[2016/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015061284
Date:30.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3060269
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3060269
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/02, A61M1/36, B01D21/28, B01L3/00, G01N15/02, G01N15/14, A61K35/12, A61K35/18, A61L33/00, C12N13/00, F04C2/00, G01N15/10, G01N33/49
[2018/09]
Former International [2016/35]A61M1/02, A61M1/36, B01D21/28, B01L3/00, G01N15/02, G01N15/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZELLWASCHVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER WELLE[2016/35]
English:CELL WASHING DEVICE USING A WAVE[2016/35]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE DE CELLULES AU MOYEN D'UNE ONDE[2016/35]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2016National basic fee paid 
23.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
12.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2018/09]
23.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2019Fee for grant paid
31.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013043170  (ROSE KLINT A [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs 0028-0031, figure 2A *;
 [X]WO2013049623  (WARNER BRIAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs 0003, 0017, 0048; figures 1, 4 *;
 [X]US2007020767  (SCHNELLE THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs 0004, 0083, 0086; figure 10 *
International search[X]WO2012125470  (FENWAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * see page 40, lines 12-27; page 41, lines 3-7 *;
 [X]US2011136645  (ELLINGBOE BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs 0027-0031; figures 1, 2 *;
 [X]US2013048565  (FIERING JASON O [US], et al) [X] 1-12,18-23 * paragraphs 0018, 0019, 0036, 0052, 0059, 0060; figures 1, 3 *;
 [A]WO2012135663  (UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US], et al) [A] 1-12,18-23 * pages 10, 16, 24, 25; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US4710162  (JOHNSON GERALD W [US]) [A] 1-12,18-23 * column 6, lines 24-39 and lines 49-55; figures 2, 3 *
ExaminationWO2013049623
 US2007020767
 US2013043170
by applicantUS2009066936
 US2010139377
 US2012196314
 US2014065117
 US7837040
 US7846382
 US7674100