Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3061110

EP3061110 - ELECTRICAL CABLE SECTION DETECTION CIRCUIT BREAKER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING SUCH A CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electricité de France
22-30 Avenue de Wagram
75008 Paris / FR
[2016/35]
Inventor(s)01 / PIGNIER, Daniel
67 Rue Hoffmann
F-92340 Bourg La Reine / FR
02 / MENGA, David
16 Résidence Clos de Verrières
F-91370 Verrieres Le Buisson / FR
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2017/40]
Former [2016/35]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date14793887.216.10.2014
[2016/35]
WO2014FR52645
Priority number, dateFR2013006025321.10.2013         Original published format: FR 1360253
[2016/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015059390
Date:30.04.2015
Language:FR
[2015/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3061110
Date:31.08.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3061110
Date:04.10.2017
Language:FR
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01H9/54, H01H71/74
[2016/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHUTZSCHALTER MIT DETEKTION EINES STROMKABELABSCHNITTES UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SOLCH EINEN SCHUTZSCHALTER[2016/35]
English:ELECTRICAL CABLE SECTION DETECTION CIRCUIT BREAKER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING SUCH A CIRCUIT BREAKER[2016/35]
French:DISJONCTEUR À DÉTECTION DE SECTION DE CÂBLE ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UN TEL DISJONCTEUR[2017/18]
Former [2016/35]DISJONCTEUR À DÉTECTION DE SECTION DE CÂBLE ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRôLE D'UN TEL DISJONCTEUR
Entry into regional phase20.04.2016National basic fee paid 
20.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
02.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2017Fee for grant paid
28.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
MT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE16.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/45]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
MT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE16.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
MT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/36]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0119187  (HAWLAN HANS [AT]) [A] 1,13 * figures 4,9; claims 1-14 *;
 [A]EP1841033  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0016]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2008204947  (SHEA JOHN JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0031]; figure 1 *