Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3068586

EP3068586 - OSCILLATORILY DRIVEN MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. & E. Fein GmbH
Hans-Fein-Strasse 81
73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd-Bargau / DE
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / GEITNER, Richard E.
Ziegelstr. 38
73431 Aalen / DE
02 / NOACK, Steffen
Am Alten Bahnhof 1
09633 Halsbrücke / DE
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Roos, Michael
C. & E. Fein GmbH
Patentabteilung
Hans-Fein-Straße 81
73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd-Bargau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/38]Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14796086.810.11.2014
[2016/38]
WO2014EP74126
Priority number, dateDE20131011245513.11.2013         Original published format: DE102013112455
[2016/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015071204
Date:21.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3068586
Date:21.09.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:B25F5/00, B24B23/04, B24B47/14, B24B47/16, B24B47/12, F15B15/12, B23D47/12, B23Q5/027, B26D5/12
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
TitleGerman:OSZILLIEREND ANTREIBBARE WERKZEUGMASCHINE[2016/38]
English:OSCILLATORILY DRIVEN MACHINE TOOL[2016/38]
French:MACHINE-OUTIL À ENTRAÎNEMENT OSCILLANT[2016/38]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2016National basic fee paid 
10.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/38]
03.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]GB567549  (BRISTOL AEROPLANE CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,7 * page 1, lines 65-75 * * page 3, lines 43-83 * * page 5, lines 51-86 * * figure 3a * [Y] 8,9,13 [I] 3-6,10-12;
 [Y]EP0248986  (ALLIED CORP [US]) [Y] 8 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 12; figure 4; claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE102009055843  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0012] , [0016]; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE10210756  (SORG REINHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0034]; figures 3,4; claim 1 *;
 [AD]DE202008013877U  (DIEM REINHARD [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1428625
 EP2283979
 DE202008013877U
 DE202012101137U