Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3050292

EP3050292 - CONTROLLING DISPLAY OF VIDEO DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2017/36]
Former [2016/31]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ENGSTRAND, Jakob Olof
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2016/31]
Application number, filing date14796957.028.10.2014
[2016/31]
WO2014US62489
Priority number, dateGB2013001933301.11.2013         Original published format: GB 201319333
US20141419111526.02.2014         Original published format: US201414191115
[2016/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015065929
Date:07.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3050292
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015
[2016/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/14, H04M1/725, H04W4/02, G01C21/36, G06F17/30
[2016/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
TitleGerman:STEUERUNG DER ANZEIGE VON VIDEODATEN[2016/31]
English:CONTROLLING DISPLAY OF VIDEO DATA[2016/31]
French:CONTRÔLE DE L'AFFICHAGE DE DONNÉES VIDÉO[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2016National basic fee paid 
29.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
11.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2019
03.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2015572  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1,6,7 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * [I] 4-8;
 [XA]JP2006254414  (SONY CORP) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1,10,13 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103] * [A] 4-8;
 [XA]JP2002300548  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,9,10 * figures 4,7 * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 2-8;
 [XA]JP2005333226  (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,9,10 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * [A] 2-8
by applicantWO2005009019