Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2999141

EP2999141 - METHOD FOR PERFORMING MEASUREMENT AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2016/12]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Yoonoh
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
02 / LEE, Sangwook
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
03 / LIM, Suhwan
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
04 / JUNG, Manyoung
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
05 / HWANG, Jinyup
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
 [2016/12]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/12]
Application number, filing date14798129.412.05.2014
[2016/12]
WO2014KR04231
Priority number, dateUS201361822414P12.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361822414 P
[2016/12]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014185676
Date:20.11.2014
Language:KO
[2014/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2999141
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.11.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00, H04W72/08, H04L5/00
[2016/44]
Former International [2016/12]H04B7/26, H04B17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON MESSUNGEN UND ENDGERÄT[2016/12]
English:METHOD FOR PERFORMING MEASUREMENT AND TERMINAL[2016/12]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION DE MESURE ET TERMINAL[2016/12]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2015Translation filed 
26.01.2015National basic fee paid 
26.01.2015Search fee paid 
26.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2015Examination requested  [2016/12]
01.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
18.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  - SAMSUNG, "RRC signalling support for CRS interference handling", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-122502_CRS INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120514), vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050606954 [X] 1,6 * sections 1, 2, 2.1, 3, 3.1 *
 [X]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Discussion on signaling support for CRS interference handling", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-122848, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120515), vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050607429 [X] 1,6 * sections 1, 2.1-2.3 *
 [X]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Network assistance for CRS Interference Cancellation", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-121617 CRS IC ASSISTANCE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120320), vol. RAN WG2, no. Jeju, South Korea; 20120326 - 20120330, XP050606375 [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * * sections 1, 2, 3.1-3.3 *
 [XI]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "Further considerations on signalling support for CRS interference cancellation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20120813 - 20120817, (20120805), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-123576, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_70/Docs/, (20120805), XP050661454 [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * * sections 1, 2, 2.1, 2.2 * [I] 2,3,7,8
 [I]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Remaining issues for signalling support for CRS IC", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122404, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600659 [I] 1-3,6-8 * sections 1, 2 *
 [I]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Preliminary discussion on FeICIC RSRP accuracy test case", vol. RAN WG4, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130408), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-131103, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_66bis/Docs/, (20130408), XP050701429 [I] 1,4-6,9,10 * tables A.9.1.8.2-1 * * sections 2, 3 *
 [I]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Preliminary Discussion on FeICIC Cell Identification Test Cases", vol. RAN WG4, no. Chicago, USA, (20130408), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-131088, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_66bis/Docs/, (20130408), XP050701414 [I] 1,4-6,9,10 * tables 8.1.8.1-1 * * sections 2, 5 *
International search[A]WO2013018990  (LG ELECTRONICS INC. ET AL.);
 [A]KR20130045240  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [AP]KR20130107158  (PANTECH CO.,LTD.);
 [A]  - LARS LINDBOM ET AL., "Enhanced Inter- cell Interference Coordination for Heterogeneous Networks in LTE-Advanced: A Survey", ARXIV.ORG, (20111207), XP002668287
 [A]  - ZTE, "Discussion on CRS interference and CSI measurements in macro-pico deployment", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #63 R1-105969, (20101115), XP050489768