Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3063628

EP3063628 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NON-VOLATILE RAM ERROR RE-MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2018  [2018/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/36]
Inventor(s)01 / CHUN, Dexter Tamio
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / KIM, Jung Pill
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / KANG, Seung Hyuk
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / KIM, Taehyun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/36]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/36]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14799303.431.10.2014
[2016/36]
WO2014US63532
Priority number, dateUS20131407048001.11.2013         Original published format: US201314070480
[2016/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015066529
Date:07.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3063628
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/10, G06F12/00
[2016/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEHLERABBILDUNG IN EINEM NICHTFLÜCHTIGEN RAM-SPEICHER[2016/36]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NON-VOLATILE RAM ERROR RE-MAPPING[2016/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE REMAPPAGE D'ERREUR DE RAM NON VOLATILE[2016/36]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2016National basic fee paid 
17.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/36]
01.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/40]
29.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2012324299  (MOSHAYEDI MARK [US] MOSHAYEDI MARK [US] ET AL) [X] 7-11 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 46; figures 2,3,4 * [Y] 1-6,12-20;
 [XY]US2008301529  (SPANEL CAROL [US] ET AL) [X] 7-11 * page 1, paragraph 13 - page 2, paragraph 13 * * page 7, paragraph 77 * * page 9, paragraph 103 - page 10, paragraph 107 * * page 13, paragraph 144 - page 14, paragraph 148 * * page 15, paragraph 158; figures 5,8A * [Y] 1-6,12-20;
 [XA]US2013275836  (INADA RYOICHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 7-11 * page 3, paragraph 68 * * page 4, paragraph 101 - page 5, paragraph 107 * * page 7, paragraph 152 - page 8, paragraph 165; figures 4,9,17,18,19 * [A] 1-6,12-20;
 [XA]US6119245  (HIRATSUKA SHINJI [JP]) [X] 7-11 * column 5, line 54 - column 8, line 11; figures 1-4 * [A] 1-6,12-20;
 [A]US2012072786  (BAHALI SUMANTA K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-6,12-20 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 13 - page 3, paragraph 19; figure 1 *