Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3078105

EP3078105 - POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LIMITING AN OUTPUT CURRENT OF A POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 26
32758 Detmold / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2016/41]For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÜRMANN, Klaus
Ernst Reuterstrasse 31
32791 Lage / DE
02 / BUSCHKAMP, Michael
Grabenstrasse 12
32791 Lage / DE
 [2016/41]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/52]
Former [2016/41]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14800027.618.11.2014
[2016/41]
WO2014EP74839
Priority number, dateDE20131011364806.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013113648
[2016/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015082207
Date:11.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3078105
Date:12.10.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015
[2016/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3078105
Date:25.12.2019
Language:DE
[2019/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02M1/32, H02H7/12, H02H9/02, H02M3/335
[2019/35]
Former International [2016/41]H02M1/32, H02H7/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STROMVERSORGUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEGRENZUNG DES AUSGANGSSTROMS DER STROMVERSORGUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2019/35]
English:POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LIMITING AN OUTPUT CURRENT OF A POWER SUPPLY DEVICE[2016/41]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LIMITATION DU COURANT DE SORTIE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE[2016/41]
Former [2016/41]Stromversorgungseinrichtung und Verfahren zum Begrenzen eines Ausgangsstroms einer Stromversorgungseinrichtung
Entry into regional phase17.05.2016National basic fee paid 
17.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
23.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2019Fee for grant paid
15.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
04.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[YDA]DE102005031833  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [YD] 1-3,8-11,14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0337] * [A] 4-7,12,13;
 [Y]US2006023383  (THIERY VINCENT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-11,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0014]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US2007103833  (HARRIS EDWIN J IV [US]) [Y] 1-3,8-11,14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011]; figures 1,6-10 *
by applicantDE102005031833