Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3000133

EP3000133 - SENSORS, METHODS OF MAKING AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qorvo US, Inc.
7628 Thorndike Road
Greensboro, NC 27409 / US
[2017/27]
Former [2016/13]For all designated states
Rapid Diagnostek, Inc.
14505 21st Avenue North
Suite 212
Plymouth, MN 55447 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEBSTER, James, Russell
3806 Victoria St.
Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US
02 / SCHILLER, Peter, J.
12370 Heather St. Nw
Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US
03 / VAN DEUSEN, Richard, Allan
1997 Stanford Avenue
St.paul, MN 55105 / US
04 / HARMON, Ian, Robert
1507 Washington St. Ne 2
Minneapolis, MN 55413 / US
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/13]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14801619.923.05.2014
[2016/13]
WO2014US39397
Priority number, dateUS201361826884P23.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361826884 P
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014190292
Date:27.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3000133
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014
[2016/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.11.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/20, G01N29/02, G01N29/036, G01N5/02, G01N33/543, H03H9/17
[2016/52]
Former International [2016/13]H01L27/20, G01N29/02, G01N29/036
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/13]
TitleGerman:SENSOREN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VORRICHTUNGEN[2016/13]
English:SENSORS, METHODS OF MAKING AND DEVICES[2016/13]
French:CAPTEURS, PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIFS[2016/13]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2015National basic fee paid 
18.12.2015Search fee paid 
18.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/13]
22.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005050164  (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US], et al) [A] 8-10,13-15 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - page 12, line 34; figures 1-4 *;
 [I]  - Anthony J Dickherber, "Development of Highly Sensitive Bulk Acoustic Wave Device Biosensor Arrays for Screening and Early Detection of Prostate Cancer", Atlanta, (20090131), URL: http://www.dtic.mil/cgi-bin/GetTRDoc?Location=U2&doc=GetTRDoc.pdf&AD=ADA510112, (20161115), XP055319800 [I] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 18, paragraph L *
 [A]  - YIHE HU ET AL, "A lateral field excited liquid acoustic wave sensor", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE, US, (20041130), vol. 51, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TUFFC.2004.1367475, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 1373 - 1380, XP011368755 [A] 2,14 * abstract * * page 1373, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1374, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TUFFC.2004.1367475
International search[X]US2006054941  (LU YICHENG [US], et al);
 [Y]US6235488  (TOM-MOY MAY [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010127600  (LOSCHONSKY MARC [DE], et al);
 [Y]  - WAGGONER, P; ET AL., "Atomic layer deposited silicon dioxide films on nanomechanical silicon nitride resonators", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 107, (2010), pages 114505 - 114505-5, URL: http://scitation.aip.org/content/aip/journal/jap/107/11/10.1063/1.3431349, XP012132929

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3431349
by applicantUS2010127600
    - P. S. WAGGONER et al., "Atomic layer deposited silicon dioxide films on nanomechanical silicon nitride resonators", Journal of Applied Physics, vol. 107, doi:doi:10.1063/1.3431349, page 114505, XP012132929

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3431349