Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2908047

EP2908047 - UNDERWATER LIGHTING APPARATUS AND UNDER-WATER ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elm Inc.
2398, Kaseda Miyabara
Minamisatsuma-shi
Kagoshima 897-1124 / JP
[2015/34]
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAHARA, Takakazu
c/o ELM Inc.
2398 Kaseda Miyabara
Minamisatsuma-shi Kagoshima 897-1124 / JP
 [2015/34]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/34]
Application number, filing date14801902.904.09.2014
[2015/34]
WO2014JP73322
Priority number, dateJP2013019812625.09.2013         Original published format: JP 2013198126
[2015/34]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015045782
Date:02.04.2015
Language:JA
[2015/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2908047
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2908047
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:F21S2/00, F21V31/03, G03B15/02, G03B15/05, G03B17/08, // F21Y115/10
[2016/42]
Former International [2015/34]F21S2/00, F21V31/03, G03B15/02, G03B15/05, G03B17/08, F21Y101/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNTERWASSERBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE UNTERWASSERVORRICHTUNG[2015/34]
English:UNDERWATER LIGHTING APPARATUS AND UNDER-WATER ELECTRONIC APPARATUS[2015/34]
French:APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE IMMERGÉ ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE IMMERGÉ[2015/34]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2014Translation filed 
28.11.2014National basic fee paid 
28.11.2014Search fee paid 
28.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/34]
24.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2017Fee for grant paid
12.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE04.09.2017
LU04.09.2017
MT04.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/36]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE04.09.2017
LU04.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE04.09.2017
LU04.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/30]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
LU04.09.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]KR20090020436  (RYU JUN SU [KR]) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1-4 * [I] 3;
 [X]ES1089931U  (LLANES MENDEZ JORDI [ES]) [X] 1,10,11 * abstract *;
 [X]CN101907282  (YANG YIBO, et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0017]; figure 4 *;
 [IY]US8444283  (MILLER STEVEN [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 15 * [Y] 5-9;
 [IY]JPS5113683U  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.) [I] 1-4,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5-9;
 [IA]DE1162870  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [I] 10,11 * column 2, line 37 - line 52; figure 2 * [A] 2;
 [Y]WO0212787  (IBG FIBER OPTICS B V [NL], et al) [Y] 5-9 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 7; figure 1 *
International search[X]JPS5113683U  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.);
 [Y]JP2013051137  (BRINTZ TECHNOLOGIE CO LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPS55118401U  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.);
 [Y]JPS4962675U  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [Y]JPH05312947  (FURUNO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JP2005327669  (NICHU GIKEN KOGYO KK)