Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3003369

EP3003369 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PYROPHOSPHATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
675 West Kendall Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / NEELON, Kelly
169 Seven Star Road
Groveland Massachusetts 01834 / US
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/15]Simpson, Tobias Rutger , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Application number, filing date14803492.927.05.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014US39547
Priority number, dateUS201361827924P28.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361827924 P
[2016/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014193821
Date:04.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3003369
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61K47/42, C01B25/42
[2016/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
Extension statesBA21.09.2015
ME21.09.2015
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT PYROPHOSPHAT[2016/15]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PYROPHOSPHATE[2016/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT UN PYROPHOSPHATE[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2015National basic fee paid 
21.09.2015Search fee paid 
21.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
25.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/17]
07.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2007098684  (RAIBEKAS ANDREI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,13 * paragraph [0130]; figure 3; example 4 * [Y] 11;
 [Y]US2004033228  (KRAUSE HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * example 1; table 2 *
International search[X]US2009018077  (THOMASON ARLEN [US], et al);
 [X]WO2007075877  (GUPTA AJAY [US]);
 [X]US4054645  (HILL BRIAN K, et al);
 [Y]US2011300163  (CHAMPION BRIAN ROBERT [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005164985  (UZAN ANDRE [FR], et al);
 [Y]US2012201812  (BRIGE ANN [BE], et al);
 [Y]US2012121580  (BHAMBHANI AKHILESH [US], et al);
 [A]US2010093624  (LOW DON [US], et al);
 [A]US2006074102  (CUSACK KEVIN [US], et al)
 [Y]  - DEBULIS, K ET AL., "Dramatic Enhancement of Enzymatic Activity in Organic Solvents by Lyoprotectants.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 41, no. 5, (19930305), pages 566 - 571, URL: http://onlinelibrary. wiley .com/doi/10.1002/bit.260410509/abstract, (20140819), XP000651683

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260410509