Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3007084

EP3007084 - USER INTERFACE METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEARCHING FOR MULTIMEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEONG, Cheol-Ho
3F
32 Yonsei-ro 7an-gil
Seodaemun-gu
Seoul 120-834 / KR
02 / SHIN, Sung-Hyuk
302-2404
20 Pangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-953 / KR
03 / YU, Bo-Hyun
102-503
56 Wanggok-ro
Uiwang-si Gyeonggi-do 437-742 / KR
04 / JOO, Jae-Seok
108-1408
289 Sujeong-ro
Sujeong-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 461-708 / KR
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/15]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14804034.828.05.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014KR04764
Priority number, dateKR2013006050228.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130060502
[2016/15]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014193161
Date:04.12.2014
Language:KO
[2014/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3007084
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F3/01, G06F3/14
[2016/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
TitleGerman:BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SUCHEN VON MULTIMEDIA-INHALTEN[2016/15]
English:USER INTERFACE METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEARCHING FOR MULTIMEDIA CONTENT[2016/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR RECHERCHER DU CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2015Translation filed 
17.12.2015National basic fee paid 
17.12.2015Search fee paid 
17.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
31.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]  - Michael G. Christel, "Accessing News Video Libraries through Dynamic Information Extraction, Summarization, and Visualization", Visual Interfaces to Digital Libraries, Berlin, Springer International Publishing, (20021127), vol. 2539, pages 98 - 115, doi:10.1007/3-540-36222-3_8, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-23677-8, XP055334329 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * section I "Introduction" * * section 2.1 "Thumbnail and Title Surrogates";; figures 1, 2 * * section 2.2 "Storyboard Surrogates";; figure 3 * * section 4 "Informedia Collages";; figure 11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-36222-3_8
International search[Y]US2007027844  (TOUB STEPHEN H [US], et al);
 [Y]US2002180774  (ERRICO JAMES [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006080716  (NISHIKAWA YUKO [US], et al);
 [A]KR100493635B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]JP2004127311  (HITACHI LTD)
by applicantUS7284188
 KR100493635B
 KR100941971B
    - J. YUAN; H. WANG; L. XIAO; W. ZHENG; J. LI; F. LIN; B. ZHANG, "A Formal Study of Shot Boundary Detection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 168 - 186, XP011161876
    - J. REN; J. JIANG; J. CHEN, "Shot Boundary Detection in MPEG Videos Using Local and Global Indicators", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 19, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2022707, pages 1234 - 1238, XP011268753

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2022707
    - Z. LIU; D. GIBBON; E. ZAVESKY; B. SHAHRARAY; P. HAFFNER, "A Fast, Comprehensive Shot Boundary Determination System", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, (200707), pages 1487 - 1490, XP031123918
    - Y. LIN; B. YEN; C. CHANG; H. YANG; G.C. LEE, "Indexing and Teaching Focus Mining of Lecture Videos", LLTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MULTIMEDI, (200912), pages 681 - 686, XP031588707
    - T.E.KIM; S.K.LIM; M.H.KIM, "A Method for Lecture Video Browsing by Extracting Presentation Slides", PROC. OF THE KIISE KOREA COMPUTING CONGRESS 2011, (2011), vol. 38, no. C, pages 119 - 122
    - MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, (200709), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 317 - 336